Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02046
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2020
Terminated:Nov 02, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
CNE DIRECT, INC.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
26 26 misc Matter Held * Thu 11/19 3:35 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status conference Concluded Re: Continued Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02046 by Kimberly J. Husted against CNE DIRECT, INC.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752353) (fdis) (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2020
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 11/02 9:33 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2046 Closed (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2020
25 25 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Thu 10/15 9:51 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
24 24 notice BNC Service of Document Tue 10/13 2:31 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (dpas)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Sua Sponte) Tue 10/13 2:30 PM
Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (dpas)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 20, 2020
22 22 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sun 09/20 9:24 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
21 21 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Fri 09/18 1:18 PM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Status Conference to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jlns)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
20 20 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/17 9:21 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02046 by Kimberly J. Husted against CNE DIRECT, INC.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752353) (fdis); Status Conference now to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
19 19 audio Audio Docket Entry Tue 09/15 2:50 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 9/15/2020 10:04:59 AM ]. File Size [ 317 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:19 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
18 18 reports Status Report Wed 09/02 10:54 AM
Status Report Re:1 Complaint Filed by Defendant CNE DIRECT, INC., Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (kwis)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
17 17 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 08/07 9:15 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
16 16 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 08/07 9:15 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
15 15 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 08/05 4:36 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 08/05 4:35 PM
NOTICE NOT SENT. REQUESTED IN ERROR. NO IMAGE AVAILABLE. BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis) Modified on 8/6/2020 (msts)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Wed 08/05 11:10 AM
Further Order Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Pre-Trial Hearing ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021. (fdis) Modified on 8/5/2020 (fdis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
12 12 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 06/25 11:27 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of11 Answer to Complaint (lars)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/25 11:25 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by CNE DIRECT, INC.. (lars)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Jury Demand Thu 06/25 11:26 AM
Jury Demand Re:1 Complaint Filed by Defendant CNE DIRECT, INC. (lars)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
10 10 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 06/10 9:44 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of9 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
9 9 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 1:42 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2020
8 8 misc Stipulation Thu 05/21 2:31 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint Filed by Defendant CNE DIRECT, INC., Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (smis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 8:07 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Thu 04/23 2:13 PM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (fdis)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Thu 04/23 2:11 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (fdis)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Thu 04/23 2:11 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (fdis)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Thu 04/23 2:10 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Thu 04/23 2:06 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Thu 04/23 2:06 PM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02046 by Kimberly J. Husted against CNE DIRECT, INC.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752353) (fdis)
Related: [-]