Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02047
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2020
Terminated:Nov 23, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Fleet Concepts, Inc.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
virtual Change of Address by Attorney (Corrective ADI Entry) Thu 11/21 9:16 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY MADE BECAUSE ENTRY WAS NOT MADE AT TIME OF ADDRESS CHANGE. On 10/22/2024, Change of Address Submitted for Attorney Arnold Wuhrman through Pacer Service Center. Address changed to: 12375 Mt. Jefferson Terrace Ste 8j Lake Oswego OR 97035-1471. IF YOUR CLIENT IS RECEIVING MAIL AT YOUR ADDRESS, IT IS YOUR RESPONSIBILITY TO SUBMIT A CHANGE OF ADDRESS FORM (EDC 2-085)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
virtual Change of Address by Attorney Mon 11/07 3:24 PM
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2020
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 11/23 9:26 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2047 Closed (fdis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
28 28 misc Matter Held * Thu 11/19 3:35 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status conference Concluded Re: Continued Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02047 by Kimberly J. Husted against Fleet Concepts, Inc.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752356) (smis) (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 06, 2020
27 27 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 11/06 9:13 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
26 26 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 11/04 3:20 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Generic Order - Links to Non-Motion Wed 11/04 3:17 PM
Order Granting24 Stipulation ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. (fdis)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding/Notice of Removal (Sua Sponte) Wed 11/04 3:19 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding/Notice of Removal. (fdis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
misc Entry - CM - Proposed Order/Notice of Hearing Request by Telephone Tue 11/03 11:37 AM
Contacted Dave from the Law Office of Christopher Daniel Sullivan on 11/3/20 regarding Failure to Submit a Proposed Order or Notice of Hearing Re:24 Stipulation (fdis)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2020
24 24 misc Stipulation Tue 11/03 11:29 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (fdis)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 20, 2020
23 23 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sun 09/20 9:24 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
22 22 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Fri 09/18 1:21 PM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Status Conference to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jlns)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
21 21 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/17 9:26 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02047 by Kimberly J. Husted against Fleet Concepts, Inc.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752356) (smis); Status Conference now to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
20 20 audio Audio Docket Entry Tue 09/15 2:50 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 9/15/2020 10:06:13 AM ]. File Size [ 109 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:27 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
19 19 reports Status Report Fri 09/04 9:04 AM
Joint Status Report Re:1 Complaint Filed by Defendant Fleet Concepts, Inc., Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (smis)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
18 18 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 08/07 9:15 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
17 17 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 08/05 4:29 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Wed 08/05 11:47 AM
Further Order Regarding Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Pre-Trial Hearing ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021. (jlns)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 11, 2020
15 15 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 06/11 1:48 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of13 Answer to Complaint,14 Exhibit(s) (smis)
Related: [-]
14 14 related Exhibit(s) Thu 06/11 1:47 PM
Exhibit(s) to13 Answer to Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/11 1:46 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Fleet Concepts, Inc.. (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
12 12 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 06/10 9:49 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of11 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
11 11 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 3:37 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 22, 2020
10 10 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Fri 05/22 9:04 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of8 Answer to Complaint,9 Exhibit(s) (smis)
Related: [-]
9 9 related Exhibit(s) Fri 05/22 9:04 AM
Exhibit(s) to8 Answer to Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/22 9:03 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Fleet Concepts, Inc.. (smis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 8:16 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Thu 04/23 2:02 PM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Thu 04/23 2:02 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (smis)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Thu 04/23 2:01 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (smis)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Thu 04/23 2:01 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Thu 04/23 2:00 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Thu 04/23 2:00 PM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02047 by Kimberly J. Husted against Fleet Concepts, Inc.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752356) (smis)
Related: [-]