Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02048
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2020
Terminated:May 10, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Freight Logistics, LLC
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Monday, May 10, 2021
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 05/10 9:44 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2048 Closed (dpas)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 24, 2021
26 26 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sat 04/24 9:13 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 22, 2021
25 25 notice BNC Service of Document Thu 04/22 1:26 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Sua Sponte) Thu 04/22 1:24 PM
Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (fdis)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2020
court BNC Returned Mail Mon 10/19 8:10 AM
Returned Mail: The following order sent to ECS Refining, Inc. 2222 S Sinclair Ave Stockton, CA 95215-7551 on 09/05/2020 was returned as undeliverable: Scheduling Order (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
23 23 misc Matter Held * Thu 09/17 4:40 PM
Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02048 by Kimberly J. Husted against Freight Logistics, LLC. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752359) (smis) (admin)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 05, 2020
22 22 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sat 09/05 9:16 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
21 21 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Thu 09/03 3:40 PM
Scheduling Order Re:1 Complaint [FEC-2] - Pre-Trial Hearing ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021. STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/15/20 AT 10:00 A.M. IS HEREBY VACATED (lbef)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2020
20 20 reports Status Report Fri 08/28 2:34 PM
Status Report Re:1 Complaint Filed by Defendant Freight Logistics, LLC, Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (kwis)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
19 19 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 08/07 9:15 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
18 18 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 08/05 4:24 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 08/05 11:19 AM
NOTICE NOT SENT. REQUESTED IN ERROR. NO IMAGE AVAILABLE. BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (pdes) Modified on 8/5/2020 (msts)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 08/05 11:17 AM
NOTICE NOT SENT. REQUESTED IN ERROR. NO IMAGE AVAILABLE. BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (pdes) Modified on 8/5/2020 (msts)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Wed 08/05 11:16 AM
Further Order Regarding Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Pre-Trial Hearing Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021. (pdes) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2020 (msts)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 08/05 10:51 AM
NOTICE DELETED - REQUESTED IN ERROR BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (pdes) Modified on 8/5/2020 (pdes)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Generic Order - Links to Non-Motion Wed 08/05 10:49 AM
ENTERED ON DOCKET IN ERROR - NO IMAGE AVAILABLE Further Order Regarding Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. (pdes) Modified on 8/5/2020 (pdes)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2020
12 12 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Fri 06/19 2:57 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of10 Answer to Complaint,11 Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party (lars)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate PARTY - Including Supplemental Fri 06/19 2:54 PM
Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party Filed by Defendant Freight Logistics, LLC (lars)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/19 2:45 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Freight Logistics, LLC. (lars)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
9 9 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 06/09 8:21 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of8 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
8 8 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 3:35 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 8:16 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Thu 04/23 2:20 PM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Thu 04/23 2:19 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (smis)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Thu 04/23 2:19 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (smis)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Thu 04/23 2:19 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Thu 04/23 2:18 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Thu 04/23 2:18 PM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02048 by Kimberly J. Husted against Freight Logistics, LLC. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752359) (smis)
Related: [-]