Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02049
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2020
Terminated:Jul 17, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Hanwa American Corp.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Thursday, July 23, 2020
court BNC Returned Mail Thu 07/23 8:10 AM
Returned Mail: The following order sent to ECS Refining, Inc. 2222 S Sinclair Ave Stockton, CA 95215-7551 on 07/02/2020 was returned as undeliverable: BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2020
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 07/17 7:26 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2049 Closed (lars)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2020
16 16 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Thu 07/02 9:18 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
15 15 notice BNC Service of Document Tue 06/30 7:01 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (lars)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2020
14 14 order Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Sua Sponte) Tue 06/30 7:00 AM
Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (lars)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
13 13 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Wed 06/24 8:53 AM
Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Hanwa American Corp. against Kimberly J. Husted Filed by Hanwa American Corp.. (lars)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
12 12 misc Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate DEBTOR - Including Supplemental Wed 06/10 9:58 AM
Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party (smis)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 06/10 9:55 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant Hanwa American Corp. (smis)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
10 10 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 06/09 8:22 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of9 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
9 9 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 1:35 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2020
8 8 misc Stipulation Thu 05/21 2:36 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint Filed by Defendant Hanwa American Corp., Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (smis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 8:19 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Thu 04/23 2:11 PM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (jlns)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Thu 04/23 2:10 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (jlns)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Thu 04/23 2:10 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (jlns)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Thu 04/23 2:10 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jlns)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Thu 04/23 2:09 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Thu 04/23 2:09 PM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02049 by Kimberly J. Husted against Hanwa American Corp.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752362) (jlns)
Related: [-]