Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02050
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2020
Terminated:May 17, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
The Hedy Company, Inc.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
virtual Change of Address by Attorney Wed 01/15 12:40 PM
On 1/15/2025, Change of Address Submitted for Attorney Charles Hastings through Pacer Service Center. Address changed to: 1330 W. Fremont Street Suite 1 Stockton CA 95203. IF YOUR CLIENT IS RECEIVING MAIL AT YOUR ADDRESS, IT IS YOUR RESPONSIBILITY TO SUBMIT A CHANGE OF ADDRESS FORM (EDC 2-085)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 17, 2021
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 05/17 10:59 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2050 Closed (lars)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 30, 2021
22 22 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 04/30 9:10 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
21 21 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 04/28 1:58 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Sua Sponte) Wed 04/28 1:56 PM
Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (fdis)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 21, 2020
virtual Change of Address by Attorney Mon 12/21 1:45 PM
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 04, 2020
court BNC Returned Mail Sun 10/04 8:10 AM
Returned Mail: The following order sent to ECS Refining, Inc. 2222 S Sinclair Ave Stockton, CA 95215-7551 on 09/06/2020 was returned as undeliverable: Scheduling Order (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
19 19 misc Matter Held * Thu 09/17 4:45 PM
Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02050 by Kimberly J. Husted against The Hedy Company, Inc.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752369) (jlns) (admin)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 06, 2020
18 18 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sun 09/06 9:21 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
17 17 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Fri 09/04 9:24 AM
Scheduling Order Re:1 Complaint - Pre-Trial Hearing ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021. STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/15/20 AT 10:00 A.M. IS HEREBY VACATED (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
16 16 reports Status Report Wed 09/02 10:43 AM
Status Report Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted, Defendant The Hedy Company, Inc. (kwis)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
15 15 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 08/07 9:15 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
14 14 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 08/05 4:21 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 08/05 11:32 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (mfrs)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Wed 08/05 11:31 AM
Further Order Regarding Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Pre-Trial Hearing Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021. (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 17, 2020
11 11 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 06/17 2:42 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of10 Answer to Complaint,10 Jury Demand (fdis)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/17 2:34 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by The Hedy Company, Inc.. (fdis)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Jury Demand Wed 06/17 2:39 PM
Jury Demand Re:1 Complaint Filed by Defendant The Hedy Company, Inc. (fdis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
9 9 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 06/10 8:56 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of8 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
8 8 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 3:34 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2020
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 2:30 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Thu 04/23 2:37 PM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (jlns)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Thu 04/23 2:30 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (jlns)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Thu 04/23 2:29 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (jlns)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Thu 04/23 2:29 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jlns)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Thu 04/23 2:28 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Thu 04/23 2:27 PM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02050 by Kimberly J. Husted against The Hedy Company, Inc.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752369) (jlns)
Related: [-]