Husted v. A.S.I Cyber Concepts, LLC.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453
California Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Fredrick E Clement |
Case #: | 2:20-ap-02051 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 25, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
A.S.I Cyber Concepts, LLC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT |
Friday, December 16, 2022 | ||
40 | 40
![]() Certificate/Proof of Service of38 Assignment of Judgment,39 Support Document [DMC-1] (rlos) |
|
39 | 39
![]() Support Document/Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment Re:38 Assignment of Judgment [DMC-1] Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (rlos) |
|
38 | 38
![]() Assignment of Judgment by Kimberly J. Husted (rlos) |
|
Monday, January 25, 2021 | ||
utility
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 01/25 10:25 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2051 Closed (fdis) |
||
Friday, January 22, 2021 | ||
court
BNC Returned Mail
Fri 01/22 8:15 AM
Returned Mail: The following order sent to Rocio Y. Hoare 15476 Vanoween Street, #102 Van Nuys, CA 91406 on 01/07/2021 was returned as undeliverable: BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (ADIrm adi) |
||
Wednesday, January 20, 2021 | ||
37 | 37
![]() Civil Minutes -- Status conference Concluded Re: Continued Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02051 by Kimberly J. Husted against A.S.I Cyber Concepts, LLC.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752373) (fdis) (admin) |
|
Friday, January 08, 2021 | ||
36 | 36
![]() Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, January 07, 2021 | ||
35 | 35
![]() Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, January 06, 2021 | ||
34 | 34
![]() BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (hlum) |
|
Tuesday, January 05, 2021 | ||
33 | 33
![]() Order Granting27 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [DMC-1] (hlum) |
|
32 | 32
![]() Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order,27 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [DMC-1],28 Declaration,29 Exhibit(s) (fdis) |
|
31 | 31
![]() BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis) |
|
30 | 30
![]() Notice of Rescheduled Status Conference Re:1 Complaint to be held on 1/20/2021 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis) |
|
Monday, January 04, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
![]() Exhibit(s) in support of28 Declaration [DMC-1] (fdis) |
|
28 | 28
![]() Declaration of Christopher D. Sullivan in support of27 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [DMC-1] (fdis) |
|
27 | 27
![]() Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [DMC-1] Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (fdis) |
|
Saturday, December 05, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, December 03, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
![]() BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis) |
|
24 | 24
![]() Entry of Default and Order Re: Default Judgment Procedures. Entry of Default of Defendant A.S.I Cyber Concepts, LLC. Request for entry of default judgment due by 1/4/2021. (fdis) |
|
Monday, November 30, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order,22 Request for Entry of Default (fdis) |
|
22 | 22
![]() Request for Entry of Default of A.S.I Cyber Concepts, LLC. Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (fdis) |
|
Friday, November 20, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 1/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis) |
|
Tuesday, November 17, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02051 by Kimberly J. Husted against A.S.I Cyber Concepts, LLC.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752373) (fdis); Status Conference now to be held on 1/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus) |
|
Tuesday, November 03, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Status Report Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (fdis) |
|
Thursday, October 08, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Certificate of Service of Reissued Summons and Complaint (fdis) |
|
Friday, October 02, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Copy of Reissued Summons Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 11/17/20 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tsef) |
|
misc
Entry - CM - Reissued Summons
Fri 10/02 3:04 PM
Reissued Summons requested by Christopher D. Sullivan, Attorney for Plaintiff (tsef) |
||
Friday, September 25, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Court's Certificate of Mailing of15 Memorandum Re: Default Papers (fdis) |
|
15 | 15
![]() Memorandum Re:13 Request for Entry of Default (fdis) |
|
Wednesday, September 23, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order,13 Request for Entry of Default (fdis) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Request for Entry of Default of A.S.I Cyber Concepts, LLC. Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (fdis) |
|
Friday, September 18, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis) |
|
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02051 by Kimberly J. Husted against A.S.I Cyber Concepts, LLC.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752373) (fdis); Status Conference now to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus) |
|
10 | 10
![]() PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 9/15/2020 10:06:35 AM ]. File Size [ 165 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:41 ]. (admin) |
|
Monday, June 08, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Certificate/Proof of Service of8 Scheduling Order (smis) |
|
Tuesday, June 02, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis) |
|
Thursday, April 23, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (fdis) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (fdis) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (fdis) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto) |
|
1 | 1
![]() (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02051 by Kimberly J. Husted against A.S.I Cyber Concepts, LLC.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752373) (fdis) |