Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02053
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2020
Terminated:Jan 22, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Guardian Data Destruction, Inc.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Monday, December 02, 2024
virtual Change of Address by Attorney Mon 12/02 2:20 PM
On 12/2/2024, Change of Address Submitted for Attorney Lovee Sarenas through Pacer Service Center. Address changed to: 550 South Hope Street Suite 1765 Los Angeles CA 90071. IF YOUR CLIENT IS RECEIVING MAIL AT YOUR ADDRESS, IT IS YOUR RESPONSIBILITY TO SUBMIT A CHANGE OF ADDRESS FORM (EDC 2-085)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2022
virtual Change of Address by Attorney Thu 06/09 8:26 AM
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
22 22 misc 9036 Entry - Bounce Back Mon 05/24 1:20 PM
On 05/21/2021, an electronic notification sent to Lovee D. Sarenas at lovee.sarenas@lewisbrisbois.com was returned to the Court as undeliverable. As a result, the Clerks Office deleted this email from our e-Filing system, and, on 05/24/2021, mailed the attached letter to Lovee D. Sarenas at his/her primary postal address. (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2021
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 01/22 9:49 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2053 Closed (fdis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
21 21 misc Stipulation Wed 12/30 9:55 AM
Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (smis)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2020
court BNC Returned Mail Mon 10/19 8:10 AM
Returned Mail: The following order sent to ECS Refining, Inc. 2222 S Sinclair Ave Stockton, CA 95215-7551 on 09/05/2020 was returned as undeliverable: Scheduling Order (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
court BNC Returned Mail Thu 09/17 8:15 AM
Returned Mail: The following order sent to Lovee D. Sarenas 622 W 5th St #4000 Los Angeles, CA 90071 on 09/05/2020 was returned as undeliverable: Scheduling Order (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
20 20 misc Matter Held * Thu 09/17 6:30 PM
Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02053 by Kimberly J. Husted against Guardian Data Destruction, Inc.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752383) (lars) (admin)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 05, 2020
19 19 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sat 09/05 9:16 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
18 18 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Thu 09/03 11:40 AM
Scheduling Order Re:1 Complaint - Pre-Trial Hearing ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021 [FEC-2]. STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/15/20 AT 10:00 A.M. IS HEREBY VACATED. (lbef)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
17 17 misc Stipulation Mon 08/31 1:45 PM
Stipulation Re:14 Scheduling Order Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (bsof)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
16 16 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 08/07 9:15 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
15 15 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 08/05 4:12 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Wed 08/05 12:07 PM
Further Order Regarding Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Pre-Trial Hearing ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021. (jlns)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2020
13 13 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Mon 07/27 8:23 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of12 Answer to Complaint [LLB-1] (fdis)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/27 8:22 AM
Answer to Complaint [LLB-1] Filed by Guardian Data Destruction, Inc.. (fdis) Modified on 7/27/2020 (fdis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
11 11 misc Stipulation Thu 06/25 11:35 AM
Second Stipulation to Extend time to Respond Re:1 Complaint Filed by Defendant Guardian Data Destruction, Inc., Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (lars)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 18, 2020
10 10 misc Stipulation Thu 06/18 11:51 AM
Stipulation to Extend Tome to Respond to1 Complaint Filed by Defendant Guardian Data Destruction, Inc., Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (bsof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
9 9 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 06/10 9:07 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of8 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
8 8 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 3:28 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 8:18 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Thu 04/23 2:55 PM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (lars)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Thu 04/23 2:54 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (lars)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Thu 04/23 2:53 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (lars)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Thu 04/23 2:53 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (lars)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Thu 04/23 2:52 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Thu 04/23 2:52 PM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02053 by Kimberly J. Husted against Guardian Data Destruction, Inc.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752383) (lars)
Related: [-]