Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02054
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2020
Terminated:Oct 20, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Facebook Inc.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 10/20 8:39 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2054 Closed (fdis)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 04, 2020
22 22 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sun 10/04 9:43 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2020
21 21 notice BNC Service of Document Fri 10/02 3:29 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Dismissal by Plaintiff Fri 10/02 3:28 PM
Notice of Dismissal (fdis)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
19 19 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Fri 09/18 9:21 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
18 18 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/17 6:32 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02054 by Kimberly J. Husted against Facebook Inc.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752387) (fdis); Status Conference now to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
17 17 reports Status Report Thu 09/03 10:38 AM
Joint Status Report Re:1 Complaint Filed by Defendant Facebook Inc., Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (lbef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
16 16 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 08/13 8:48 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of13 Scheduling Order (fdis)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
15 15 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 08/07 9:15 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
14 14 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 08/05 4:09 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Wed 08/05 12:13 PM
Further Order Regarding Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Pre-Trial Hearing ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021. (jlns)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
12 12 misc Stipulation Wed 06/24 10:54 AM
Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond Re:1 Complaint Filed by Defendant Facebook Inc., Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (lars)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
11 11 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 06/09 8:20 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of10 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
10 10 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 1:37 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2020
9 9 misc Stipulation Thu 05/21 2:35 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint Filed by Defendant Facebook Inc. (smis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
8 8 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 8:15 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
7 7 related Exhibit(s) Thu 04/23 2:45 PM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (fdis)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order to Confer Thu 04/23 2:44 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (fdis)
Related: [-]
5 5 related Exhibit(s) Thu 04/23 2:44 PM
ENTERED ON DOCKET IN ERROR - NO IMAGE AVAILABLE Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (smis) Modified on 4/23/2020 (smis)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Thu 04/23 2:43 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (fdis)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Thu 04/23 2:43 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Thu 04/23 2:41 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Thu 04/23 2:40 PM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02054 by Kimberly J. Husted against Facebook Inc.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752387) (fdis)
Related: [-]