Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02055
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2020
Terminated:Jan 28, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
JACKSON MOVING & STORAGE INC.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Friday, January 28, 2022
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 01/28 7:17 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2055 Closed (lars)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
28 28 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Wed 01/12 9:15 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
27 27 notice BNC Service of Document Mon 01/10 1:01 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (lars)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Sua Sponte) Mon 01/10 12:54 PM
Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (lars)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 20, 2021
25 25 order Generic Order - Links to Non-Motion Mon 11/22 10:05 AM
IT IS ORDERED that the pre-trial conference is concluded Re:1 Complaint ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. (lars)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
24 24 misc Matter Held * Fri 11/19 9:36 AM
Civil Minutes -- Concluded Re: Continued Pre-Trial Conference Re: Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers and to Disallow Claims -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02055 by Kimberly J. Husted against JACKSON MOVING & STORAGE INC.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752530) (fdis) (auto)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 25, 2021
23 23 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sat 09/25 9:09 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
22 22 notice BNC Service of Document Thu 09/23 1:18 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (lars)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Set/Continue/Reschedule Hearing Thu 09/23 1:17 PM
Order to Continue Pre-Trial Conference Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02055 by Kimberly J. Husted against JACKSON MOVING & STORAGE INC.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752530) (fdis). Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/16/2021 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (lars)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
20 20 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/23 9:10 AM
Civil Minutes -- Pre-Trial Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02055 by Kimberly J. Husted against JACKSON MOVING & STORAGE INC.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752530) (fdis); Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/16/2021 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
court BNC Returned Mail Fri 09/18 8:10 AM
Returned Mail: The following order sent to ECS Refining, Inc. 2222 S. Sinclair Ave. Stockton, CA 95215-7551 on 09/04/2020 was returned as undeliverable: BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
19 19 misc Matter Held * Thu 09/17 6:45 PM
Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02055 by Kimberly J. Husted against JACKSON MOVING & STORAGE INC.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752530) (fdis) (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 04, 2020
18 18 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 09/04 9:14 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
17 17 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 09/02 9:01 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (kwis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
16 16 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Wed 09/02 8:48 AM
Scheduling Order Re:1 Complaint [FEC-2] - Pre-Trial Hearing ; Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021. (kwis) STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/15/20 AT 10:00 AM IS HEREBY VACATED Modified on 9/2/2020 (kwis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2020
15 15 misc Stipulation Thu 08/27 1:58 PM
Stipulation Re:12 Scheduling Order [FEC-1] Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (fdis)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
14 14 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 08/07 9:15 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
13 13 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 08/05 4:05 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Wed 08/05 12:19 PM
Further Order Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Pre-Trial Hearing ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021. (fdis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
11 11 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 06/10 9:50 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of10 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
10 10 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 3:30 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2020
9 9 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 05/07 12:48 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of8 Answer to Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/07 12:47 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by JACKSON MOVING & STORAGE INC.. (smis)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 12:36 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Thu 04/23 4:23 PM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (fdis)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Thu 04/23 4:22 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (fdis)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Thu 04/23 4:21 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (fdis)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Thu 04/23 4:21 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Thu 04/23 4:19 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Thu 04/23 4:19 PM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02055 by Kimberly J. Husted against JACKSON MOVING & STORAGE INC.. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752530) (fdis)
Related: [-]