Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02057
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2020
Terminated:Oct 26, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
RSM US LLP
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Monday, October 26, 2020
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 10/26 11:10 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2057 Closed (fdis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 08, 2020
23 23 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Thu 10/08 9:31 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
22 22 notice BNC Service of Document Tue 10/06 12:23 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Dismissal by Plaintiff Tue 10/06 12:22 PM
Notice of Dismissal (fdis)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
20 20 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Fri 09/18 9:23 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
19 19 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/17 6:44 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02057 by Kimberly J. Husted against RSM US LLP. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752557) (fdis); Status Conference now to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
18 18 reports Status Report Thu 09/03 2:32 PM
Status Report Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (lbef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
17 17 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 08/13 8:50 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of13 Scheduling Order (fdis)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
16 16 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 08/07 9:15 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
15 15 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 08/05 4:00 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 08/05 11:23 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (pdes)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Wed 08/05 11:22 AM
Further Order Regarding Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Pre-Trial Hearing Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021. (pdes)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2020
12 12 order Extend Time (Order) Thu 07/02 12:41 PM
Order Granting11 Motion/Application to Extend Time (lars)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
11 11 motion Extend Time - Including Amended Motion Wed 07/01 11:49 AM
Motion/Application to Extend Time Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (lars)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
10 10 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 06/10 9:51 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of9 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
9 9 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 1:28 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2020
8 8 misc Stipulation Thu 05/21 2:40 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted, Defendant RSM US LLP (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2020
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 12:41 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Fri 04/24 6:28 AM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (fdis)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Fri 04/24 6:27 AM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (fdis)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Fri 04/24 6:27 AM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Fri 04/24 6:29 AM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (fdis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Fri 04/24 6:25 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Fri 04/24 6:24 AM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02057 by Kimberly J. Husted against RSM US LLP. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752557) (fdis)
Related: [-]