Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02058
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2020
Terminated:Jan 11, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Monday, January 11, 2021
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 01/11 10:01 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2058 Closed (fdis)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 25, 2020
25 25 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 12/25 9:14 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
24 24 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 12/23 1:17 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Sua Sponte) Wed 12/23 1:14 PM
Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (fdis)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 04, 2020
court BNC Returned Mail Sun 10/04 8:10 AM
Returned Mail: The following order sent to ECS Refining, Inc. 2222 S Sinclair Ave Stockton, CA 95215-7551 on 09/06/2020 was returned as undeliverable: Scheduling Order (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
22 22 misc Matter Held * Thu 09/17 6:55 PM
Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02058 by Kimberly J. Husted against Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752560) (fdis) (admin)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 06, 2020
21 21 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sun 09/06 9:21 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
20 20 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Fri 09/04 9:33 AM
Scheduling Order Re:1 Complaint - Pre-Trial Hearing ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021. STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/15/20 AT 10:00 A.M. IS HEREBY VACATED (smis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
19 19 order Admission to Appear pro hac vice (Order) Wed 09/02 3:12 PM
Order Granting18 Motion/Application for Admission to Practice pro hac vice (kwis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
17 17 reports Status Report Tue 09/01 12:32 PM
Joint Status Report Re:1 Complaint Filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (vcaf)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
18 18 motion Admission to Practice pro hac vice - Including Amended Motion Tue 09/01 5:15 PM
Motion/Application for Admission to Practice pro hac vice by Sarah Goldberg (vcaf)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
16 16 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 08/07 9:15 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
15 15 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 08/05 3:56 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 08/05 11:29 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (pdes)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Wed 08/05 11:29 AM
Further Order Regarding Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Pre-Trial Hearing Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021. (pdes)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2020
11 11 misc Jury Demand Thu 07/02 12:10 PM
Jury Demand Re:1 Complaint Filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (lars)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
12 12 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 07/02 12:18 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of11 Answer to Complaint,11 Jury Demand (lars)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 07/02 12:08 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (lars)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
10 10 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 06/09 8:27 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of9 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
9 9 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 1:24 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 22, 2020
8 8 misc Stipulation Fri 05/22 11:07 AM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint Filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2020
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 2:40 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Fri 04/24 6:41 AM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (fdis)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Fri 04/24 6:41 AM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (fdis)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Fri 04/24 6:40 AM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Fri 04/24 6:42 AM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (fdis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Fri 04/24 6:38 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Fri 04/24 6:38 AM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02058 by Kimberly J. Husted against Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752560) (fdis)
Related: [-]