Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02060
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2020
Terminated:Apr 18, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Integra Supply LLC.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Monday, April 18, 2022
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 04/18 8:26 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2060 Closed (fdis)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 02, 2022
29 29 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sat 04/02 9:07 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2022
28 28 notice BNC Service of Document Thu 03/31 12:22 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (lars)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
27 27 order Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Sua Sponte) Thu 03/31 12:22 PM
Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (lars)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 20, 2021
26 26 order Generic Order - Links to Non-Motion Mon 11/22 11:02 AM
IT IS ORDERED that the pre-trial conference is concluded Re:1 Complaint ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. (lars)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
25 25 misc Matter Held * Fri 11/19 9:42 AM
Civil Minutes -- Concluded Re: Continued Pre-Trial Conference Re: Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers and to Disallow Claims -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02060 by Kimberly J. Husted against Integra Supply LLC.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752567) (lars) (auto)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 25, 2021
24 24 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sat 09/25 9:09 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
23 23 notice BNC Service of Document Thu 09/23 1:24 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (lars)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Set/Continue/Reschedule Hearing Thu 09/23 1:23 PM
Order to Continue Pre-Trial Conference Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02060 by Kimberly J. Husted against Integra Supply LLC.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752567) (lars) Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/16/2021 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (lars)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
21 21 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/23 9:17 AM
Civil Minutes -- Pre-Trial Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02060 by Kimberly J. Husted against Integra Supply LLC.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752567) (lars); Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/16/2021 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 19, 2020
20 20 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sat 09/19 9:19 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
18 18 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Thu 09/17 11:10 AM
Scheduling Order Re:1 Complaint [FEC-2] - Pre-Trial Hearing ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021. (fdis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
19 19 misc Matter Held * Thu 09/17 9:50 PM
Civil Minutes -- Concluded Re: Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02060 by Kimberly J. Husted against Integra Supply LLC.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752567) (lars) (admin)
Related: [-]
17 17 audio Audio Docket Entry Tue 09/15 2:50 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 9/15/2020 10:10:02 AM ]. File Size [ 745 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:03:06 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
16 16 reports Status Report Wed 09/02 10:48 AM
Status Report Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted, Defendant Integra Supply LLC. (kwis)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
15 15 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 08/07 9:15 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
14 14 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 08/05 3:52 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 08/05 11:40 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (mfrs)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Wed 08/05 11:39 AM
Further Order Regarding Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Pre-Trial Hearing Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021. (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
11 11 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 06/10 9:41 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of10 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
10 10 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 3:26 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 28, 2020
9 9 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 05/28 7:53 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of8 Answer to Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/28 7:52 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Integra Supply LLC.. (smis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 8:20 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Fri 04/24 6:52 AM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (lars)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Fri 04/24 6:52 AM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (lars)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Fri 04/24 6:51 AM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (lars)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Fri 04/24 6:53 AM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (lars)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Fri 04/24 6:50 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Fri 04/24 6:50 AM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02060 by Kimberly J. Husted against Integra Supply LLC.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752567) (lars)
Related: [-]