Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02061
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2020
Terminated:Mar 21, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
MCA Financial Group LTD.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Monday, March 21, 2022
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 03/21 8:10 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2061 Closed (lars)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 05, 2022
36 36 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sat 03/05 9:06 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 03, 2022
35 35 notice BNC Service of Document Thu 03/03 2:24 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (lars)
Related: [-]
34 34 order Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Sua Sponte) Thu 03/03 2:22 PM
Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (lars)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 20, 2021
33 33 order Generic Order - Links to Non-Motion Mon 11/22 11:09 AM
IT IS ORDERED that the pre-trial conference is concluded Re:1 Complaint ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. (lars)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
32 32 misc Matter Held * Fri 11/19 9:48 AM
Civil Minutes -- Concluded Re: Continued Pre-Trial Conference Re: Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers and to Disallow Claims -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02061 by Kimberly J. Husted against MCA Financial Group LTD.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752572) (lars) (auto)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 10, 2021
court BNC Returned Mail Sun 10/10 8:15 AM
Returned Mail: The following order sent to Randye B. Soref 2049 Century Park East Ste 2300 Los Angeles, CA 90067-3125 on 09/25/2021 was returned as undeliverable: BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (auto adi)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 25, 2021
31 31 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sat 09/25 9:09 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
30 30 notice BNC Service of Document Thu 09/23 1:56 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (lars)
Related: [-]
29 29 order Set/Continue/Reschedule Hearing Thu 09/23 1:55 PM
Order to Continue Pre-Trial Conference Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02061 by Kimberly J. Husted against MCA Financial Group LTD.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752572) (lars) Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/16/2021 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (lars)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
28 28 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/23 9:23 AM
Civil Minutes -- Pre-Trial Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02061 by Kimberly J. Husted against MCA Financial Group LTD.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752572) (lars); Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/16/2021 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 04, 2020
court BNC Returned Mail Sun 10/04 8:10 AM
Returned Mail: The following order sent to ECS Refining, Inc. 2222 S Sinclair Ave Stockton, CA 95215-7551 on 09/06/2020 was returned as undeliverable: BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
27 27 misc Matter Held * Thu 09/17 6:55 PM
Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02061 by Kimberly J. Husted against MCA Financial Group LTD.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752572) (lars) (admin)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 06, 2020
26 26 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sun 09/06 9:21 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
25 25 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sun 09/06 9:21 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 04, 2020
24 24 notice BNC Service of Document Fri 09/04 9:39 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (smis)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Fri 09/04 9:38 AM
Scheduling Order Re:1 Complaint - Pre-Trial Hearing ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021. STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/15/20 AT 10:00 A.M. IS HEREBY VACATED (smis)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2020
22 22 reports Status Report Fri 08/28 3:16 PM
Status Report Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted, Defendant MCA Financial Group LTD. (kwis)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
21 21 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 08/07 9:15 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
20 20 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 08/07 9:15 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
19 19 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 08/05 3:47 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 08/05 11:41 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (pdes)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Wed 08/05 11:39 AM
Further Order Regarding Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Pre-Trial Hearing Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021. (pdes)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2020
16 16 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Thu 07/30 9:17 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 28, 2020
15 15 notice BNC Service of Document Tue 07/28 10:29 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Admission to Appear pro hac vice (Order) Tue 07/28 10:21 AM
Order Granting13 Motion/Application for Admission to Practice pro hac vice (fdis)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 27, 2020
13 13 motion Admission to Practice pro hac vice - Including Amended Motion Mon 07/27 4:04 PM
Motion/Application for Admission to Practice pro hac vice by Todd A. Burgess (fdis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
12 12 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 07/07 1:47 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of11 Answer to Complaint (lars)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2020
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/07 10:45 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by MCA Financial Group LTD.. (lars)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
10 10 motion Extend Time - Including Amended Motion Tue 06/30 4:00 PM
ENTERED ON DOCKET IN ERROR-NO IMAGE AVAILABLE Motion/Application to Extend Time Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (lars) Modified on 6/30/2020 (lars)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
9 9 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 06/09 8:31 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of8 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
8 8 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 3:24 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2020
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 12:38 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Fri 04/24 6:58 AM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (lars)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Fri 04/24 6:58 AM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (lars)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Fri 04/24 6:57 AM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (lars)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Fri 04/24 6:59 AM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (lars)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Fri 04/24 6:57 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Fri 04/24 6:57 AM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02061 by Kimberly J. Husted against MCA Financial Group LTD.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752572) (lars)
Related: [-]