Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02068
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2020
Terminated:Nov 02, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Staffmark Investement LLC.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
16 16 misc Matter Held * Fri 11/20 9:15 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status conference Concluded Re: Continued Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02068 by Kimberly J. Husted against Staffmark Investement LLC.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752606) (lars) (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2020
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 11/02 9:35 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2068 Closed (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2020
15 15 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Thu 10/15 9:51 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
14 14 notice BNC Service of Document Tue 10/13 2:29 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (dpas)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Dismissal by Plaintiff Tue 10/13 2:28 PM
Notice of Dismissal (dpas)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
12 12 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Fri 09/18 10:54 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
11 11 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/17 7:22 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02068 by Kimberly J. Husted against Staffmark Investement LLC.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752606) (lars); Status Conference now to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
10 10 reports Status Report Thu 09/03 2:35 PM
Status Report Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (lbef)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
9 9 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 06/09 8:37 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of8 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
8 8 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 3:18 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2020
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 2:30 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Fri 04/24 7:23 AM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (lars)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Fri 04/24 7:22 AM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (lars)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Fri 04/24 7:20 AM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (lars)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Fri 04/24 7:23 AM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (lars)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Fri 04/24 7:20 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Fri 04/24 7:20 AM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02068 by Kimberly J. Husted against Staffmark Investement LLC.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752606) (lars)
Related: [-]