Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02069
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2020
Terminated:Nov 16, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
SSI Shredding Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
23 23 misc Matter Held * Fri 11/20 9:15 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status conference Concluded Re: Continued Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02069 by Kimberly J. Husted against SSI Shredding Systems, Inc.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752611) (lars) (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 16, 2020
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 11/16 3:29 PM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2069 Closed (ltrf)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 31, 2020
22 22 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sat 10/31 9:08 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 29, 2020
21 21 notice BNC Service of Document Thu 10/29 2:01 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Dismissal by Plaintiff Thu 10/29 2:00 PM
Notice of Dismissal (fdis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 08, 2020
19 19 misc Certificate of Service of Reissued Summons and Complaint Thu 10/08 4:00 PM
Certificate of Service of Reissued Summons and Complaint (fdis)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2020
18 18 misc Reissued Summons Fri 10/02 3:00 PM
Copy of Reissued Summons Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 11/17/20 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (tsef)
Related: [-]
misc Entry - CM - Reissued Summons Fri 10/02 3:04 PM
Reissued Summons requested by Christopher D. Sullivan, Attorney for Plaintiff (tsef)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 25, 2020
17 17 misc Court's Certificate of Mailing (via USPS) (Produces Form) Fri 09/25 4:02 PM
Court's Certificate of Mailing of16 Memorandum Re: Default Papers (fdis)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs misc Memorandum Re: Default Papers Fri 09/25 4:01 PM
Memorandum Re:14 Request for Entry of Default (fdis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
15 15 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 09/24 8:17 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order,14 Request for Entry of Default (fdis)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Request for Entry of Default Thu 09/24 8:16 AM
Request for Entry of Default of SSI Shredding Systems, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (fdis)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 20, 2020
13 13 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sun 09/20 9:24 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
12 12 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Fri 09/18 10:04 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Status Conference to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jlns)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
11 11 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/17 9:00 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02069 by Kimberly J. Husted against SSI Shredding Systems, Inc.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752611) (lars); Status Conference now to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
10 10 audio Audio Docket Entry Tue 09/15 2:50 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 9/15/2020 10:13:38 AM ]. File Size [ 117 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:29 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
9 9 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 06/09 8:37 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of8 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
8 8 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 3:17 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2020
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 2:28 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Fri 04/24 7:28 AM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (lars)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Fri 04/24 7:28 AM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (lars)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Fri 04/24 7:27 AM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (lars)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Fri 04/24 7:28 AM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (lars)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Fri 04/24 7:27 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Fri 04/24 7:27 AM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02069 by Kimberly J. Husted against SSI Shredding Systems, Inc.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752611) (lars)
Related: [-]