Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02071
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2020
Terminated:Jan 25, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
3C Environmental Solutions.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Friday, December 16, 2022
39 39 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Fri 12/16 12:38 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of37 Assignment of Judgment,38 Support Document [DMC-1] (rlos)
Related: [-]
38 38 related Support Document Fri 12/16 12:37 PM
Support Document/Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment Re:37 Assignment of Judgment [DMC-1] Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (rlos)
Related: [-]
37 37 3 pgs misc Assignment of Judgment Fri 12/16 12:35 PM
Assignment of Judgment by Kimberly J. Husted (rlos)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 25, 2021
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 01/25 10:29 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2071 Closed (fdis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
36 36 misc Matter Held * Thu 01/21 6:45 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status conference Concluded Re: Continued Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02071 by Kimberly J. Husted against 3C Environmental Solutions.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752626) (lars) (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 08, 2021
35 35 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 01/08 9:12 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
34 34 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 01/06 3:08 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (hlum)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
33 33 order Default Judgment (Sua sponte) Wed 01/06 3:06 PM
Order Granting29 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [DMC-1] (hlum)
Related: [-]
32 32 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 01/05 1:14 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order,29 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [DMC-1],30 Declaration,31 Exhibit(s) (fdis)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2021
31 31 related Exhibit(s) Tue 01/05 9:08 AM
Exhibit(s) in support of30 Declaration [DMC-1] (fdis)
Related: [-]
30 30 related Declaration Tue 01/05 9:06 AM
Declaration of Christopher D. Sullivan in support of29 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [DMC-1] (fdis)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Default Judgment - Including Amended Motion Tue 01/05 9:05 AM
Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [DMC-1] Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (fdis)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 11, 2020
28 28 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Fri 12/11 9:41 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 1/20/2021 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (kwis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
27 27 misc Matter Continued * Thu 12/10 1:03 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02071 by Kimberly J. Husted against 3C Environmental Solutions.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752626) (lars); Status Conference now to be held on 1/20/2021 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 05, 2020
26 26 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sat 12/05 9:13 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
25 25 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sat 12/05 9:13 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
24 24 notice BNC Service of Document Thu 12/03 2:34 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice BNC Service of Document Thu 12/03 2:29 PM
ENTERED ON DOCKET IN ERROR - NO IMAGE AVAILABLE BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis) Modified on 12/3/2020 (fdis)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice BNC Service of Document Thu 12/03 2:28 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Entry of Default & Order Re: Default Judgment Procedures Thu 12/03 2:27 PM
Entry of Default and Order Re: Default Judgment Procedures. Entry of Default of Defendant 3C Environmental Solutions. Request for entry of default judgment due by 1/4/2021. (fdis)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2020
20 20 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 12/01 10:23 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order,19 Request for Entry of Default (fdis)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Request for Entry of Default Tue 12/01 10:20 AM
Request for Entry of Default of 3C Environmental Solutions Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (fdis)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 21, 2020
18 18 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Mon 11/23 8:05 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 1/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
17 17 misc Matter Continued * Fri 11/20 9:14 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02071 by Kimberly J. Husted against 3C Environmental Solutions.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752626) (lars); Status Conference now to be held on 1/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
16 16 reports Status Report Tue 11/03 12:56 PM
Status Report Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (fdis)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 18, 2020
court BNC Returned Mail Sun 10/18 8:10 AM
Returned Mail: The following order sent to ECS Refining Inc. 2222 S Sinclair Ave Stockton, CA 95215-7551 on 09/20/2020 was returned as undeliverable: Order to Set/Continue/Reschedule Hearing (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
15 15 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Wed 10/14 6:52 AM
Certificate of Service of Reissued Summons and Complaint (fdis) Modified on 10/14/2020 (fdis)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 09, 2020
14 14 misc Reissued Summons Fri 10/09 11:19 AM
Copy of Reissued Summons Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 12/8/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (msts)
Related: [-]
misc Entry - CM - Reissued Summons Fri 10/09 11:20 AM
Reissued Summons requested by Christopher Sullivan (msts)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 20, 2020
13 13 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sun 09/20 9:24 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
12 12 order Set/Continue/Reschedule Hearing Fri 09/18 10:30 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02071 by Kimberly J. Husted against 3C Environmental Solutions.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752626) (lars) ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Status Conference to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (lars)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
11 11 misc Matter Continued * Fri 09/18 8:25 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02071 by Kimberly J. Husted against 3C Environmental Solutions.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752626) (lars); Status Conference now to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
10 10 audio Audio Docket Entry Tue 09/15 2:50 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 9/15/2020 10:14:02 AM ]. File Size [ 389 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:37 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
9 9 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 06/09 8:19 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of8 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
8 8 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 3:15 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 7:49 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Fri 04/24 7:38 AM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (lars)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Fri 04/24 7:37 AM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (lars)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Fri 04/24 7:37 AM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (lars)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Fri 04/24 7:38 AM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (lars)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Fri 04/24 7:37 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Fri 04/24 7:36 AM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02071 by Kimberly J. Husted against 3C Environmental Solutions.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752626) (lars)
Related: [-]