Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02074
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2020
Terminated:Dec 28, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
SOS Security LLC
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Monday, December 28, 2020
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 12/28 4:11 PM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2074 Closed (bsof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
27 27 misc Matter Held * Mon 12/28 8:00 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status conference Concluded Re: Continued Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02074 by Kimberly J. Husted against SOS Security LLC. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752682) (lars) (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 11, 2020
26 26 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 12/11 9:12 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
25 25 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 12/09 10:22 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
24 24 misc Stipulation Wed 12/09 8:53 AM
ENTERED ON DOCKET IN ERROR - NO IMAGE AVAILABLE Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (fdis) Modified on 12/9/2020 (fdis)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Sua Sponte) Wed 12/09 10:20 AM
Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (fdis)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 21, 2020
23 23 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Mon 11/23 8:09 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 12/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
22 22 misc Matter Continued * Fri 11/20 9:32 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02074 by Kimberly J. Husted against SOS Security LLC. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752682) (lars); Status Conference now to be held on 12/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
21 21 audio Audio Docket Entry Tue 11/17 12:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 11/17/2020 10:12:32 AM ]. File Size [ 373 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:33 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
20 20 reports Status Report Wed 11/04 7:58 AM
Joint Status Report Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (fdis)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 20, 2020
19 19 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sun 09/20 9:24 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
18 18 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Fri 09/18 1:24 PM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Status Conference to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jlns)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
17 17 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/17 9:33 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02074 by Kimberly J. Husted against SOS Security LLC. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752682) (lars); Status Conference now to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
16 16 audio Audio Docket Entry Tue 09/15 2:50 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 9/15/2020 10:18:18 AM ]. File Size [ 121 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:30 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 04, 2020
15 15 reports Status Report Fri 09/04 2:23 PM
Joint Status Report Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted, Defendant SOS Security LLC (smis)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 08, 2020
14 14 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sat 08/08 9:18 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
13 13 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Thu 08/06 8:57 AM
Further Order Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Pre-Trial Hearing ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021. (fdis) Modified on 8/6/2020 (fdis)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 27, 2020
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/28 9:49 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by SOS Security LLC. (fdis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
11 11 misc Stipulation Wed 06/24 12:31 PM
Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted, Defendant SOS Security LLC (lars)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
10 10 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 06/10 9:32 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of9 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
9 9 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 1:26 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2020
8 8 misc Stipulation Thu 05/21 2:41 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted, Defendant SOS Security LLC (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2020
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 2:23 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Fri 04/24 7:49 AM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (lars)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Fri 04/24 7:49 AM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (lars)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Fri 04/24 7:48 AM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (lars)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Fri 04/24 7:50 AM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (lars)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Fri 04/24 7:48 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Fri 04/24 7:48 AM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02074 by Kimberly J. Husted against SOS Security LLC. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752682) (lars)
Related: [-]