Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02075
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2020
Terminated:Nov 23, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Scottie Tennis
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
22 22 misc Matter Held * Thu 12/10 8:45 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status conference Concluded Re: Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02075 by Kimberly J. Husted against Scottie Tennis. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752899) (fdis) (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2020
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 11/23 9:32 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2075 Closed (fdis)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 22, 2020
court BNC Returned Mail Sun 11/22 8:10 AM
Returned Mail: The following order sent to Scottie Tennis 4008 Caribbean Cmm Fremont, CA 94555-3133 on 11/05/2020 was returned as undeliverable: BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
21 21 misc Matter Held * Fri 11/20 9:45 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status conference Concluded Re: Continued Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02075 by Kimberly J. Husted against Scottie Tennis. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752899) (fdis) (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 05, 2020
20 20 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Thu 11/05 9:14 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
19 19 notice BNC Service of Document Tue 11/03 3:04 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Dismissal by Plaintiff Tue 11/03 3:03 PM
Notice of Dismissal (fdis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
17 17 misc Certificate of Service of Reissued Summons and Complaint Wed 10/14 6:56 AM
Certificate of Service of Reissued Summons and Complaint (fdis)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 09, 2020
16 16 misc Reissued Summons Fri 10/09 11:21 AM
Copy of Reissued Summons Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 12/8/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (msts)
Related: [-]
misc Entry - CM - Reissued Summons Fri 10/09 11:22 AM
Reissued Summons requested by Christopher Sullivan (msts)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
15 15 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Fri 09/18 10:15 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
14 14 misc Matter Continued * Fri 09/18 8:23 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02075 by Kimberly J. Husted against Scottie Tennis. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752899) (fdis); Status Conference now to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
13 13 audio Audio Docket Entry Tue 09/15 2:50 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 9/15/2020 10:18:43 AM ]. File Size [ 165 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:41 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
12 12 misc Reissued Summons Thu 07/09 2:10 PM
Copy of Reissued Summons Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (msts)
Related: [-]
misc Entry - CM - Reissued Summons Thu 07/09 2:15 PM
Reissued Summons requested by Aiemee Low from Daniel Sullivan's Office. (msts)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2020
11 11 misc Reissued Summons Mon 06/29 12:06 PM
Copy of Reissued Summons Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (pdes)
Related: [-]
misc Entry - CM - Reissued Summons Mon 06/29 12:08 PM
Reissued Summons requested by Aiemee Low (pdes)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
10 10 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 06/09 8:35 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of9 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
9 9 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 3:14 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
8 8 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 8:20 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 7:50 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Fri 04/24 1:02 PM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (fdis)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Fri 04/24 1:01 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (fdis)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Fri 04/24 1:01 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (fdis)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Fri 04/24 1:00 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Fri 04/24 12:59 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Fri 04/24 12:59 PM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02075 by Kimberly J. Husted against Scottie Tennis. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752899) (fdis)
Related: [-]
misc EFILED RECEIPT - Adversary Fee Paid Fri 04/24 7:31 PM
Adversary Proceeding Fee Paid ($350.00, Receipt Number: 361264, eFilingID: 6752899) (auto)
Related: [-]