Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02076
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2020
Terminated:May 03, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
National Technology and Engineering Solutions of Sandia, LLC
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Monday, May 03, 2021
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 05/03 10:52 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2076 Closed (fdis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 15, 2021
20 20 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Thu 04/15 9:13 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 13, 2021
19 19 notice BNC Service of Document Tue 04/13 3:01 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Sua Sponte) Tue 04/13 2:59 PM
Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (fdis)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2020
court BNC Returned Mail Mon 10/19 8:10 AM
Returned Mail: The following order sent to ECS Refining, Inc. 2222 S Sinclair Ave Stockton, CA 95215-7551 on 09/05/2020 was returned as undeliverable: Scheduling Order (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
17 17 misc Matter Held * Thu 09/17 7:50 PM
Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02076 by Kimberly J. Husted against National Technology and Engineering Solutions of Sandia, LLC. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752903) (fdis) (admin)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 05, 2020
16 16 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sat 09/05 9:16 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
15 15 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Thu 09/03 11:52 AM
Scheduling Order Re:1 Complaint - Pre-Trial Hearing ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021 [FEC-2]. STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/15/20 AT 10:00 A.M. IS HEREBY VACATED. (lbef)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
14 14 misc Stipulation Mon 08/31 1:43 PM
Stipulation Re:12 Scheduling Order Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (bsof)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 08, 2020
13 13 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sat 08/08 9:18 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
12 12 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Thu 08/06 9:11 AM
Further Order Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Pre-Trial Hearing ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021. (fdis) Modified on 8/6/2020 (fdis)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
11 11 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 06/09 8:22 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of10 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
10 10 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 3:13 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
9 9 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 05/26 9:46 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of8 Answer to Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/26 9:45 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by National Technology and Engineering Solutions of Sandia, LLC. (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2020
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Fri 04/24 1:17 PM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (fdis)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order to Confer Fri 04/24 1:15 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (fdis)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Fri 04/24 1:15 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (fdis)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Fri 04/24 1:15 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Fri 04/24 1:13 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Fri 04/24 1:13 PM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02076 by Kimberly J. Husted against National Technology and Engineering Solutions of Sandia, LLC. (Fee Not Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6752903) (fdis)
Related: [-]