Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02082
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2020
Terminated:Jul 06, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Concur Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Monday, July 06, 2020
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 07/06 10:45 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2082 Closed (lars)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 20, 2020
14 14 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sat 06/20 9:20 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 18, 2020
13 13 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 06/18 4:07 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of11 Notice of Dismissal (bsof)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice BNC Service of Document Thu 06/18 4:04 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (bsof)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Dismissal by Plaintiff Thu 06/18 4:03 PM
Notice of Dismissal (bsof)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
10 10 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 06/10 9:47 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of9 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
9 9 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 1:40 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2020
8 8 misc Stipulation Thu 05/21 2:33 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint Filed by Defendant Concur Technologies, Inc., Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (smis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 8:08 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 27, 2020
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Mon 04/27 7:32 AM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (fdis)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Mon 04/27 7:31 AM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (fdis)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Mon 04/27 7:31 AM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Mon 04/27 7:33 AM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (fdis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Mon 04/27 7:30 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Mon 04/27 7:29 AM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02082 by Kimberly J. Husted against Concur Technologies, Inc.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6753089) (fdis)
Related: [-]