Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02084
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2020
Terminated:Apr 26, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Double R Electric Incorporated
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Monday, April 26, 2021
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 04/26 11:51 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2084 Closed (fdis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
46 46 misc Matter Held * Thu 01/21 6:50 PM
Civil Minutes -- Hearing Dropped as moot Re:15 - Motion/Application to Dismiss Cause(s) of Action from Complaint [PP-1] (admin)
Related: [-]
45 45 misc Matter Held * Thu 01/21 6:45 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status conference Concluded Re: Continued Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02084 by Kimberly J. Husted against Double R Electric Incorporated. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6753120) (fdis) (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2021
44 44 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Thu 01/07 9:17 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
43 43 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Thu 01/07 9:17 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
42 42 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Thu 01/07 9:17 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
41 41 notice BNC Service of Document Tue 01/05 1:31 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
40 40 notice Notice of Dismissal by Plaintiff Tue 01/05 1:30 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (fdis)
Related: [-]
39 39 notice BNC Service of Document Tue 01/05 1:10 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
38 38 misc Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Hearing/Conference/Trial Tue 01/05 1:08 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Status Conference Re:1 Complaint to be held on 1/20/2021 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis)
Related: [-]
37 37 notice BNC Service of Document Tue 01/05 1:05 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Hearing/Conference/Trial Tue 01/05 1:03 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Re:15 Motion/Application to Dismiss Cause(s) of Action from Complaint [PP-1] [PP-1] to be held on 1/20/2021 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (fdis)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 21, 2020
35 35 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Mon 11/23 8:19 AM
Order to Continue Hearing Re:15 Motion/Application to Dismiss Cause(s) of Action from Complaint [PP-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Hearing to be held on 1/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (fdis)
Related: [-]
34 34 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Mon 11/23 8:13 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 1/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
33 33 misc Matter Continued * Fri 11/20 9:54 AM
Civil Minutes -- Hearing continued Re:15 Motion/Application to Dismiss Cause(s) of Action from Complaint [PP-1]; Hearing to be held on 1/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (jbus)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Matter Continued * Fri 11/20 9:47 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02084 by Kimberly J. Husted against Double R Electric Incorporated. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6753120) (fdis); Status Conference now to be held on 1/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
31 31 reports Status Report Tue 11/03 1:03 PM
Joint Status Report Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (fdis)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 18, 2020
court BNC Returned Mail Sun 10/18 8:10 AM
Returned Mail: The following order sent to ECS Refining Inc. 2222 S Sinclair Ave Stockton, CA 95215-7551 on 09/20/2020 was returned as undeliverable: Order to Set/Continue/Reschedule Hearing (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 20, 2020
30 30 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sun 09/20 9:24 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
29 29 order Set/Continue/Reschedule Hearing Fri 09/18 9:54 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02084 by Kimberly J. Husted against Double R Electric Incorporated. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6753120) (fdis) ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Status Conference to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (lars)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
27 27 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 09/17 1:30 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of26 Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Hearing/Conference Trial [PP-1] (fdis)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Hearing/Conference/Trial Thu 09/17 1:22 PM
Notice of Continued Hearing Re:15 Motion/Application to Dismiss Cause(s) of Action from Complaint [PP-1] to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (fdis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
28 28 misc Matter Continued * Fri 09/18 9:01 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02084 by Kimberly J. Husted against Double R Electric Incorporated. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6753120) (fdis); Status Conference now to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
25 25 audio Audio Docket Entry Tue 09/15 2:50 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 9/15/2020 10:20:52 AM ]. File Size [ 677 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:49 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
24 24 appeal Receipt of Pleadings and Documents Tue 09/15 12:55 PM
Receipt of Pleadings and Documents from U.S. District Court Re:18 Motion/Application for Withdrawal of Reference [PP-1] (msts)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 14, 2020
23 23 related Transmittal/Acknowledgment of Withdrawal of Reference Documents to District Court Mon 09/14 1:58 PM
Acknowledgment of Transmittal to the District Court (fdis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 09, 2020
22 22 related Transmittal/Acknowledgment of Withdrawal of Reference Documents to District Court Wed 09/09 12:26 PM
Photocopy of Transmittal to the District Court of the18 Motion/Application for Withdrawal of Reference (fdis)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 09/09 12:16 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
20 20 related Filing of Motion to Withdraw the Reference Wed 09/09 12:14 PM
Notice of Filing of18 Motion/Application for Withdrawal of Reference [PP-2] (fdis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
19 19 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 09/09 9:46 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of15 Motion/Application to Dismiss Cause(s) of Action from Complaint [PP-1],16 Notice of Hearing (fdis)
Related: [-]
19 19 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 09/09 9:48 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of18 Motion/Application for Withdrawal of Reference [PP-2] Re: (fdis)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Withdrawal of Reference Wed 09/09 9:30 AM
Motion/Application for Withdrawal of Reference [PP-2] Re:1 Complaint Filed by Defendant Double R Electric Incorporated (Fee Paid $181) (eFilingID: 6840410) (fdis)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Jury Demand Wed 09/09 8:47 AM
Jury Demand Re:1 Complaint Filed by Defendant Double R Electric Incorporated (fdis)
Related: [-]
16 16 related Notice of Hearing Wed 09/09 8:43 AM
Notice of Hearing Re:15 Motion/Application to Dismiss Cause(s) of Action from Complaint [PP-1] to be held on 10/6/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A. (fdis)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Dismiss Cause(s) of Action Wed 09/09 8:40 AM
Motion/Application to Dismiss Second, Third and Fifth Claims for Relief in the Trustee's Complaint for Failure to State Claim [PP-1] Filed by Defendant Double R Electric Incorporated (fdis)
Related: [-]
misc EFILED RECEIPT - Motion Fee Paid Wed 09/09 9:31 AM
Motion Fee Paid ($181.00, Receipt Number: 364448, eFilingID: 6840410) (auto)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
14 14 reports Status Report Wed 09/02 10:52 AM
Status Report Re:1 Complaint Filed by Defendant Double R Electric Incorporated, Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (kwis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 06, 2020
13 13 misc Stipulation Thu 08/06 2:22 PM
First Stipulation to Extend Time To Answer Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (fdis)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2020
12 12 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Fri 07/10 3:32 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of1 Complaint,4 Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program,6 Exhibit(s),8 Scheduling Order, Reissued Summons Memo (lars)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Certificate of Service of Reissued Summons and Complaint Fri 07/10 3:31 PM
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
10 10 misc Reissued Summons Thu 07/09 2:09 PM
Copy of Reissued Summons Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (msts)
Related: [-]
misc Entry - CM - Reissued Summons Thu 07/09 2:17 PM
Reissued Summons requested by Aiemee Low from Daniel Sullivan's Office (msts)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2020
9 9 misc Reissued Summons Mon 06/29 12:15 PM
Copy of Reissued Summons Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (pdes)
Related: [-]
misc Entry - CM - Reissued Summons Mon 06/29 12:16 PM
Reissued Summons requested by Aiemee Low (pdes)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
8 8 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 3:07 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 8:11 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 27, 2020
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Mon 04/27 7:47 AM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (fdis)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Mon 04/27 7:47 AM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (fdis)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Mon 04/27 7:47 AM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Mon 04/27 7:48 AM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (fdis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Mon 04/27 7:46 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Mon 04/27 7:46 AM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02084 by Kimberly J. Husted against Double R Electric Incorporated. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6753120) (fdis)
Related: [-]