Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02086
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2020
Terminated:Jan 11, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Palmer Kazanjian Wohl Hodson
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Monday, January 11, 2021
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 01/11 10:03 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2086 Closed (fdis)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 25, 2020
20 20 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 12/25 9:14 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
19 19 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 12/23 1:01 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (ltrf)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Sua Sponte) Wed 12/23 1:01 PM
Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (ltrf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
17 17 misc Matter Held * Thu 09/17 8:05 PM
Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02086 by Kimberly J. Husted against Palmer Kazanjian Wohl Hodson. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6753168) (fdis) (admin)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 05, 2020
16 16 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sat 09/05 9:16 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
15 15 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Thu 09/03 11:57 AM
Scheduling Order Re:1 Complaint - Pre-Trial Hearing ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021 [FEC-2]. STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/15/20 AT 10:00 A.M. IS HEREBY VACATED. (lbef)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
14 14 misc Stipulation Mon 08/31 3:26 PM
Stipulation Re:12 Scheduling Order Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (bsof)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 08, 2020
13 13 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sat 08/08 9:18 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
12 12 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Thu 08/06 10:03 AM
Further Order Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Pre-Trial Hearing ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021. (fdis) Modified on 8/6/2020 (fdis)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
11 11 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 06/09 8:23 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of10 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
10 10 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 1:22 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2020
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/27 1:44 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Palmer Kazanjian Wohl Hodson. (smis)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 22, 2020
8 8 misc Stipulation Fri 05/22 11:08 AM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint Filed by Defendant Palmer Kazanjian Wohl Hodson, Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2020
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 27, 2020
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Mon 04/27 8:57 AM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (fdis)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Mon 04/27 8:57 AM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (fdis)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Mon 04/27 8:58 AM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (fdis)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Mon 04/27 8:56 AM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Mon 04/27 8:55 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Mon 04/27 8:54 AM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02086 by Kimberly J. Husted against Palmer Kazanjian Wohl Hodson. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6753168) (fdis)
Related: [-]