Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02088
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2020
Terminated:Jan 26, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
WM Lamptracker, Inc.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 01/26 9:51 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2088 Closed (fdis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
23 23 misc Matter Held * Thu 01/21 5:50 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status conference Concluded Re: Continued Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02088 by Kimberly J. Husted against WM Lamptracker, Inc.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6753193) (smis) (admin)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 21, 2020
22 22 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Mon 11/23 8:24 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 1/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
21 21 misc Matter Continued * Fri 11/20 10:00 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02088 by Kimberly J. Husted against WM Lamptracker, Inc.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6753193) (smis); Status Conference now to be held on 1/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 07, 2020
20 20 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sat 11/07 9:12 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 05, 2020
19 19 notice BNC Service of Document Thu 11/05 12:55 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Dismissal by Plaintiff Thu 11/05 12:54 PM
Notice of Dismissal (fdis)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
17 17 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Fri 09/18 9:55 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
16 16 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/17 7:56 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02088 by Kimberly J. Husted against WM Lamptracker, Inc.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6753193) (smis); Status Conference now to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
15 15 reports Status Report Thu 09/03 1:11 PM
Joint Status Report Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted, Defendant WM Lamptracker, Inc. (lbef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
14 14 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 08/13 8:54 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of12 Scheduling Order [FEC-1] (fdis)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 08, 2020
13 13 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sat 08/08 9:18 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
12 12 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Thu 08/06 10:12 AM
Further Order Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Pre-Trial Hearing ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021. (fdis) Modified on 8/6/2020 (fdis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
11 11 misc Stipulation Wed 06/24 10:50 AM
Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted, Defendant WM Lamptracker, Inc. (lars)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2020
10 10 misc Stipulation Mon 06/15 10:26 AM
Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted, Defendant WM Lamptracker, Inc. (cjim)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
9 9 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 06/09 8:39 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of8 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
8 8 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 3:04 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2020
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 2:40 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 27, 2020
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Mon 04/27 8:07 AM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (smis)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Mon 04/27 8:07 AM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (smis)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Mon 04/27 8:06 AM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Mon 04/27 8:08 AM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Mon 04/27 8:06 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Mon 04/27 8:05 AM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02088 by Kimberly J. Husted against WM Lamptracker, Inc.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6753193) (smis)
Related: [-]