Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02089
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2020
Terminated:Nov 16, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
S&D Recycling
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Friday, December 16, 2022
30 30 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Fri 12/16 12:43 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of28 Assignment of Judgment,29 Support Document [DMC-1] (rlos)
Related: [-]
29 29 related Support Document Fri 12/16 12:42 PM
Support Document/Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment Re:28 Assignment of Judgment [DMC-1] Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (rlos)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Assignment of Judgment Fri 12/16 12:40 PM
Assignment of Judgment by Kimberly J. Husted (rlos)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
27 27 misc Matter Held * Fri 11/20 10:10 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status conference Concluded Re: Continued Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02089 by Kimberly J. Husted against S&D Recycling. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6753200) (smis) Modified on 4/27/2020 (smis). (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 16, 2020
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 11/16 3:31 PM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2089 Closed (ltrf)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2020
26 26 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 10/30 9:08 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 28, 2020
25 25 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 10/28 8:45 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
24 24 order Default Judgment (Sua sponte) Wed 10/28 8:12 AM
Default Judgment Against Defendant S&D Recycling [DMC-1] (fdis) Modified on 10/28/2020 (fdis)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Default Judgment (Order) Wed 10/28 8:44 AM
Order Granting21 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [DMC-1] (fdis)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2020
23 23 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 10/27 10:48 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order,21 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [DMC-1],22 Declaration (fdis)
Related: [-]
22 22 related Declaration Tue 10/27 9:37 AM
Declaration of Christopher D. Sullivan in support of21 Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [DMC-1] (fdis)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Default Judgment - Including Amended Motion Tue 10/27 9:34 AM
Motion/Application for Entry of Default Judgment [DMC-1] Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (fdis)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 27, 2020
20 20 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sun 09/27 9:20 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 25, 2020
19 19 notice BNC Service of Document Fri 09/25 4:16 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Entry of Default & Order Re: Default Judgment Procedures Fri 09/25 4:15 PM
Entry of Default and Order Re: Default Judgment Procedures. Entry of Default of Defendant S&D Recycling Request for entry of default judgment due by 10/26/2020. (fdis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
17 17 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 09/24 7:59 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order,16 Request for Entry of Default (fdis)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Request for Entry of Default Thu 09/24 7:57 AM
Request for Entry of Default of S&D Recycling Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (fdis)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 20, 2020
15 15 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sun 09/20 9:24 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
14 14 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Fri 09/18 1:06 PM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Status Conference to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jlns)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
13 13 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/17 9:10 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02089 by Kimberly J. Husted against S&D Recycling. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6753200) (smis) Modified on 4/27/2020 (smis).; Status Conference now to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
12 12 audio Audio Docket Entry Tue 09/15 2:50 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 9/15/2020 10:23:36 AM ]. File Size [ 133 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:33 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
11 11 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 06/09 8:34 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of10 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
10 10 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 3:03 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2020
9 9 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 12:43 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 12:43 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 27, 2020
7 7 misc Reissued Summons Mon 04/27 11:17 AM
Copy of Reissued Summons Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Mon 04/27 8:12 AM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (smis) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2020 (msts)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Mon 04/27 8:12 AM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (smis) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2020 (msts)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Mon 04/27 8:12 AM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Mon 04/27 8:13 AM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Mon 04/27 8:11 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Mon 04/27 8:11 AM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02089 by Kimberly J. Husted against S&D Recycling. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6753200) (smis) Modified on 4/27/2020 (smis)
Related: [-]