Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02090
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2020
Terminated:Nov 17, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Debri-Tech
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
26 26 misc Matter Held * Fri 11/20 10:10 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status conference Concluded Re: Continued Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02090 by Kimberly J. Husted against Debri-Tech. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6753203) (smis) (admin)
Related: [-]
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 11/17 3:06 PM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2090 Closed (fdis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
25 25 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Wed 11/04 9:20 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2020
24 24 notice BNC Service of Document Mon 11/02 9:39 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2020
23 23 notice Notice of Dismissal by Plaintiff Mon 11/02 9:38 AM
Notice of Dismissal (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
22 22 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Fri 09/18 10:01 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
21 21 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/17 8:02 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02090 by Kimberly J. Husted against Debri-Tech. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6753203) (smis); Status Conference now to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 06, 2020
20 20 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sun 09/06 9:21 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 05, 2020
19 19 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sat 09/05 9:16 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 04, 2020
18 18 notice BNC Service of Document Fri 09/04 1:25 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (msts)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
17 17 order Vacating/Striking/Setting Aside (Links to Non-Order Document) Thu 09/03 4:25 PM
Order Vacating/Striking/Setting Aside10 Answer to Complaint [FEC-1] (lbef)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Set/Continue/Reschedule Hearing Thu 09/03 4:27 PM
Order to Continue Status Conference [FEC-1] Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02090 by Kimberly J. Husted against Debri-Tech. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6753203) (smis) ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Status Conference to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A; Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/17/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (lbef) Modified on 9/4/2020 (lbef)
Related: [-]
misc Pre-Trial Hearing Set Fri 09/04 12:27 PM
Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/17/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Re:1 Complaint (lbef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
16 16 reports Status Report Tue 09/01 3:03 PM
Joint Status Report Re:1 Complaint Filed by Defendant Debri-Tech, Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (vcaf)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 08, 2020
15 15 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sat 08/08 9:18 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
14 14 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sat 08/08 9:18 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 06, 2020
13 13 notice BNC Service of Document Thu 08/06 10:53 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
12 12 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Thu 08/06 10:51 AM
Further Order Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Pre-Trial Hearing ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021. (fdis) Modified on 8/6/2020 (fdis)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
11 11 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Tue 06/09 8:30 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of9 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 06/08 3:01 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Debri-Tech. (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
9 9 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 3:01 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
8 8 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 8:10 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 27, 2020
7 7 misc Reissued Summons Mon 04/27 11:23 AM
Copy of Reissued Summons Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Mon 04/27 8:19 AM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (smis)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Mon 04/27 8:19 AM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (smis)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Mon 04/27 8:19 AM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Mon 04/27 8:20 AM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Mon 04/27 8:16 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Mon 04/27 8:16 AM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02090 by Kimberly J. Husted against Debri-Tech. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6753203) (smis)
Related: [-]