Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02091
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2020
Terminated:Feb 01, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Goodwill Industries of San Joaquin Valley, Inc.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Defendant
Goodwill Industries of Southern California, Inc.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Monday, February 01, 2021
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 02/01 8:53 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2091 Closed (fdis)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 16, 2021
27 27 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sat 01/16 9:07 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
26 26 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sat 01/16 9:07 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 14, 2021
25 25 notice BNC Service of Document Thu 01/14 10:30 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice BNC Service of Document Thu 01/14 10:28 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
23 23 order Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Sua Sponte) Thu 01/14 10:24 AM
Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (fdis)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Dismissal by Plaintiff Thu 01/14 10:19 AM
Notice of Dismissal (fdis)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 04, 2020
court BNC Returned Mail Sun 10/04 8:10 AM
Returned Mail: The following order sent to ECS Refining, Inc. 2222 S Sinclair Ave Stockton, CA 95215-7551 on 09/06/2020 was returned as undeliverable: Scheduling Order (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 20, 2020
court BNC Returned Mail Sun 09/20 8:10 AM
Returned Mail: The following order sent to Christopher H. Bayley 400 E Van Buren St #100 Phoenix, AZ 85004-2239 on 09/06/2020 was returned as undeliverable: Scheduling Order (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
21 21 misc Matter Held * Thu 09/17 8:20 PM
Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02091 by Kimberly J. Husted against Goodwill Industries of San Joaquin Valley, Inc., Goodwill Industries of Southern California, Inc.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6753210) (smis) Modified on 4/27/2020 (smis). (admin)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 06, 2020
20 20 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sun 09/06 9:21 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 04, 2020
19 19 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Fri 09/04 9:49 AM
Scheduling Order Re:1 Complaint - Pre-Trial Hearing ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021. STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/15/20 AT 10:00 A.M. IS HEREBY VACATED (smis)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
18 18 reports Status Report Tue 09/01 11:53 AM
Joint Status Report Re:1 Complaint Filed by Defendant Goodwill Industries of San Joaquin Valley, Inc., Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted (vcaf)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 08, 2020
17 17 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sat 08/08 9:18 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
16 16 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Thu 08/06 11:11 AM
Further Order Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Pre-Trial Hearing ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021. (fdis)
Related: [-]
15 15 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 08/05 8:39 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of14 Answer to Complaint (fdis)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2020
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 08/04 9:39 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Goodwill Industries of San Joaquin Valley, Inc.. (fdis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2020
13 13 order Extend Time (Order) Thu 07/02 12:42 PM
Order Granting12 Motion/Application to Extend Time (lars)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
12 12 motion Extend Time - Including Amended Motion Wed 07/01 2:58 PM
Motion/Application to Extend Time Filed by Defendant Goodwill Industries of San Joaquin Valley, Inc.(lars) Modified on 7/2/2020 (lars)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
11 11 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 06/10 9:40 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of10 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
10 10 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 3:00 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
9 9 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 8:18 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 8:17 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 27, 2020
7 7 misc Reissued Summons Mon 04/27 11:27 AM
Copy of Reissued Summons Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Mon 04/27 8:24 AM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (smis) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2020 (msts)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Mon 04/27 8:24 AM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (smis) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2020 (msts)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Mon 04/27 8:24 AM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Mon 04/27 8:25 AM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Mon 04/27 8:23 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Mon 04/27 8:23 AM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02091 by Kimberly J. Husted against Goodwill Industries of San Joaquin Valley, Inc., Goodwill Industries of Southern California, Inc.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6753210) (smis) Modified on 4/27/2020 (smis)
Related: [-]