Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02092
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2020
Terminated:Oct 20, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Industrial Scientific Corporation
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 10/20 8:50 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-2092 Closed (fdis)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 04, 2020
21 21 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Sun 10/04 9:43 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2020
20 20 notice BNC Service of Document Fri 10/02 2:59 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (fdis)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Dismissal by Plaintiff Fri 10/02 2:49 PM
Notice of Dismissal. (fdis)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
18 18 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Fri 09/18 10:13 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:1 Complaint ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (fdis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
17 17 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/17 9:37 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02092 by Kimberly J. Husted against Industrial Scientific Corporation. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6753222) (smis); Status Conference now to be held on 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (jbus)
Related: [-]
16 16 audio Audio Docket Entry Tue 09/15 2:50 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 9/15/2020 10:24:04 AM ]. File Size [ 109 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:27 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 04, 2020
15 15 reports Status Report Fri 09/04 2:24 PM
Joint Status Report Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted, Defendant Industrial Scientific Corporation (smis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
14 14 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 08/13 8:51 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of12 Scheduling Order [FEC-1] (fdis) Modified on 8/13/2020 (fdis)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 08, 2020
13 13 utility BNC Service of Order (Certificate) Sat 08/08 9:18 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Order as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
12 12 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Thu 08/06 11:18 AM
Further Order Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Pre-Trial Hearing ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/21/2021 at 03:00 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A Discovery due by 6/8/2021. (fdis)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 26, 2020
11 11 misc Stipulation Mon 06/29 7:47 AM
Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted, Defendant Industrial Scientific Corporation (lars)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
10 10 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 06/10 9:50 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of9 Scheduling Order (smis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
9 9 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Tue 06/02 1:34 PM
Order Regarding (1) Service of Summons and Complaint;(2) Enlargement of Deadlines to Respond to Complaint;(3) Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures; (4) Status Conference(including instructions to the Clerk of the Court); and(5) Consents to Final Order and Judgments Re:1 Complaint [FEC-1] - Status Conference to be held on 9/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2020
8 8 misc Stipulation Thu 05/21 2:37 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Kimberly J. Husted, Defendant Industrial Scientific Corporation (smis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/07 8:19 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 27, 2020
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Mon 04/27 8:29 AM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (smis)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Mon 04/27 8:29 AM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (smis)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Mon 04/27 8:29 AM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint; Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (smis)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Mon 04/27 8:30 AM
Exhibit(s) to1 Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Mon 04/27 8:28 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (auto)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Mon 04/27 8:28 AM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 20-02092 by Kimberly J. Husted against Industrial Scientific Corporation. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 6753222) (smis)
Related: [-]