Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-22453

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Fredrick E Clement
Case #: 2:20-ap-02093
Nature of Suit81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest
2 Bankruptcy - Other
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2020
Terminated:Aug 25, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kenneth Taggart
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Defendant
James Taggart
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Defendant
Jack Rockwell
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Defendant
Sinclair Partners, LLC
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Defendant
ECS Big Town, LLC
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Defendant
All Metals, Inc.
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly J. Husted
Represented By
Christopher Daniel Sullivan
contact info

GPO Dec 15 2020
Memorandum Opinion/Decision Re: 41 Motion/Application to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding/Notice of Removal [PH-2] ; This order is Transmitted to BNC for Service. (ltrf)
GPO Dec 15 2020
Memorandum Opinion/Decision Re: 48 Motion/Application to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding/Notice of Removal [DB-2] (ltrf)

Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Thursday, September 23, 2021
139 139 misc 9036 Entry - Bounce Back Thu 09/23 3:35 PM
On 09/23/2021, an electronic notification sent to Howard M. Privette at howard.privette@troutman.com was returned to the Court as undeliverable. As a result, the Clerks Office deleted this email from our e-Filing system, and, on 09/23/2021, mailed the attached letter to Howard M. Privette at his/her primary postal address. (admin)
Related: [-]