Michel Valenzuela et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Frederick F Mumm |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-03826 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 27, 2020 |
Case in other court: | California Eastern, 1:20-cv-00529 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 24, 2020 2:19 AM PDT |
Petitioner
Abigail Valenzuela
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
Michel Valenzuela
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 04, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 11/04 5:22 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Abigail Valenzuela.(Barry, David) |
|
Tuesday, April 28, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
transfer
MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form
Tue 04/28 8:52 AM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (esa) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)
Tue 04/28 8:39 AM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern |
|
Monday, April 27, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
mdlcmp
Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received
Tue 04/28 8:46 AM
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 47 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 4/27/20 regarding transfer of Case No. 1:20-cv-00529-AWI-JLT from Eastern District of California. Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-02814 AB (FFMx). (esa) |
|
3 | 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-47). CASE TRANSFERRED to Central District of California. MDL 2814. (Gonzalez, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/28/2020.] | |
Tuesday, April 14, 2020 | ||
2 | 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Martin-Gill, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/28/2020.] | |
Att: 1 JLT Worksheet, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
Monday, April 13, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court, case number BCV-20-100618 by Ford Motor Company.(Dorenkamp, Theodore) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/28/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Theodore Dorenkamp III, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 11 Notice of Interested Parties, | ||
Att: 12 Notice of Related Cases, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit B | ||
RECEIPT number 0972-8840768 for $400.00 paid on 4/13/2020 by Theodore Dorenkamp fbo Ford Motor Company. (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/28/2020.] |