Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-12269

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50592
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2020
Terminated:Jun 26, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
MDC Energy LLC
280 East 96th Street Suite 210
Indianapolis, IN 46240
Represented By
MDC Energy LLC
contact info
Defendant
MDC Texas Operator LLC
280 East 96th Street Suite 210
Indianapolis, IN 46240
Represented By
MDC Texas Operator LLC
contact info
Defendant
MDC Reeves Energy LLC
280 East 96th Street Suite 210
Indianapolis, IN 46240
Represented By
MDC Reeves Energy LLC
contact info
Defendant
Natixis, New York Branch
Represented By
Natixis, New York Branch
contact info
Plaintiff
Alamo Pressure Pumping, LLC
Represented By
Raymond Howard Lemisch
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Domenic E. Pacitti
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, June 26, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Mon 06/26 3:44 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50592 Closed (DMC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Tue 05/04 8:49 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50592 Closed (FMo)
Related: [-]
utility Reopen AP Case Tue 05/04 1:42 PM
Adversary Case Reopened. Closed in error. (FMo)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
21 21 court Case Reassigned Mon 04/26 4:36 PM
Order Reassigning Case. Judge Craig Todd Goldblatt added to case. Involvement of Judge Christopher S. Sontchi Terminated (BA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2020
20 20 notice Appearance - Notice Thu 10/15 5:08 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Alamo Pressure Pumping, LLC. (Lemisch, Raymond)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Appear pro hac vice Thu 10/15 4:38 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice Julie Aberneth Related [+] Order Signed on 10/15/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 17
18 18 order Appear pro hac vice Thu 10/15 4:36 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice Gregory D. Binn Related [+] Order Signed on 10/15/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 16
17 17 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Thu 10/15 3:31 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Julie Abernethy, Esquire . Receipt Number 3206260, Filed by Alamo Pressure Pumping, LLC. (Lemisch, Raymond)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Thu 10/15 3:29 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Gregory D. Binns, Esq. . Receipt Number 3206260, Filed by Alamo Pressure Pumping, LLC. (Lemisch, Raymond)
Related: [-]
misc Add Attorney Thu 10/15 5:12 PM
Attorney Gregory Binns and Raymond Howard Lemisch for Alamo Pressure Pumping, LLC, Julie Abernethy and Raymond Howard Lemisch for Alamo Pressure Pumping, LLC added to case Filed by Alamo Pressure Pumping, LLC. (Lemisch, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
15 15 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 09/21 3:45 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by Alamo Pressure Pumping, LLC. (Lemisch, Raymond)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 09/21 2:07 PM
Answer to Counterclaim Related [+] Filed by Alamo Pressure Pumping, LLC (Lemisch, Raymond)
Related: [-] 7
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, August 31, 2020
13 13 notice Appearance - Notice Mon 08/31 10:53 AM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Alamo Pressure Pumping, LLC. (Mudge, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
12 12 24 pgs order Order Fri 08/07 2:11 PM
An Order has been entered in this adversary proceeding directing the procedural consolidation of this adversary proceeding pending under Adv. No. 20-50553 (CSS). The docket in Adv. No. 20-50553 (CSS) should be consulted for all matters concerning this adversary proceeding. Order Signed on 8/7/2020 (Murin, Leslie)
Related: [-]
11 11 4 pgs order Order Fri 08/07 10:55 AM
ORDER (I) PROCEDURALLY CONSOLIDATINGADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS, AND (II) SETTINGCERTAIN DEADLINES WITH RESPECT THERETO Related [+] Order Signed on 8/7/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 9
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, August 06, 2020
10 10 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Thu 08/06 4:05 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Joint Motion of Defendants for Entry of an Order (I) Procedurally Consolidating Adversary Proceedings, and (II) Setting Certain Deadlines with Respect Thereto Filed by MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy, LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Energy, LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Partners LLC. (Turlington, Brett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
9 9 motion Motion to Consolidate Wed 07/22 2:58 PM
Motion to Consolidate Joint Motion of Defendants for Entry of an Order (I) Procedurally Consolidating Adversary Proceedings, and (II) Setting Certain Deadlines with Respect Thereto Filed by MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy, LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Energy, LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Partners LLC. (Turlington, Brett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 07/01 9:20 PM
Amended Complaint to Add additional fact information Filed by Alamo Pressure Pumping, LLC Related [+] AP Summons Served due date: 9/29/2020. (Pacitti, Domenic)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Friday, May 29, 2020
7 7 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Fri 05/29 5:46 PM
Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Natixis, New York Branch against Alamo Pressure Pumping, LLC Filed by Natixis, New York Branch Mediation due date: 09/28/2020.(Fay, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, May 28, 2020
6 6 10 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/28 2:34 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by MDC Energy LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC Mediation due date: 09/25/2020.(Turlington, Brett)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, April 30, 2020
5 5 order Appear pro hac vice Thu 04/30 11:10 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice Craig T. Enoc Related [+] Order Signed on 4/30/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 2
Wednesday, April 29, 2020
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 04/29 4:13 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants MDC Energy LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, Natixis, New York Branch. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 6/29/2020. (Pacitti, Domenic)
Related: [-] ument1
3 3 crditcrd none Wed 04/29 4:10 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50592 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9746379, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Wed 04/29 3:54 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Craig T. Enoch, Esq. . Receipt Number 2910011, Filed by Alamo Pressure Pumping, LLC. (Lemisch, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 28, 2020
1 1 15 pgs cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 04/28 8:17 PM
Adversary case 20-50592 Complaint and Request for Declaratory Judgment to Determine Validity, Priority, and Extent of Mineral Liens on the Debtors' Property by Alamo Pressure Pumping, LLC against MDC Energy LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, Natixis, New York Branch. Fee Amount $350 (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)). (Pacitti, Domenic)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1