Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:11-bk-12574

Michigan Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Scott W Dales
Case #: 1:14-ap-80104
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2014
Terminated:Jan 07, 2015
Last checked: Friday Sep 16, 2022 12:24 PM EDT
Defendant
Broadriver Communications Corporation
Represented By
Erik H. Olson
The Olson Law Firm LLC
contact info
Defendant
Pro Marketing Sales, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas Rosseland
Bodker Ramsey Andrews
contact info
Erik H. Olson
The Olson Law Firm LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Thomas C. Richardson
PO Box 51067
Kalamazoo, MI 49005
Plaintiff
Thomas C. Richardson
PO Box 51067
Kalamazoo, MI 49005
Represented By
John T. Piggins
Miller Johnson
contact info
Thomas P. Sarb
Miller Johnson
contact info


Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago
Friday, November 17, 2017
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Tue 11/21 9:15 AM
Receipt of Prorated Adversary Filing Fee - $293.00 by GH. Receipt Number 278371. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 17, 2014
14 14 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Filed by Plaintiff Thomas C. Richardson. (Sarb, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 14, 2014
13 13 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendants Broadriver Communications Corporation, Pro Marketing Sales, Inc., Plaintiff Thomas C. Richardson (Piggins, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 11, 2014
12 12 Notice of Appearance by Defendant Pro Marketing Sales, Inc.. (Rosseland, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 17, 2014
Pretrial Hearing Held. Related [+] Adj. Without Date. (vkw)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Thomas C. Richardson
Wednesday, July 16, 2014
11 11 Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Disclosures Pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7026(a)(1).. Filed by Plaintiff Thomas C. Richardson (Piggins, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 14, 2014
10 10 Certificate of Service of Initial Disclosures.. Filed by Defendant Broadriver Communications Corporation (Olson, Erik)
Related: [-]
9 9 Certificate of Service of Initial Disclosures.. Filed by Defendant Pro Marketing Sales, Inc. (Olson, Erik)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 08, 2014
8 8 Discovery Plan Pursuant to 7026(f) Order Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Thomas C. Richardson (Piggins, John)
Related: [-] 6 7026(f)Order (Judge Dales)
Saturday, June 14, 2014
7 7 BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 06/14/2014. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 12, 2014
6 6 Order Establishing Dates for 7026(f) Conference, Filing Discovery Plan and Scheduling Pretrial Conference. Parties shall meet in person or telephonically at least once on or before June 26, 2014 to satisfy requirements pursuant to FRBP 7026(f). A report signed by all parties outlining discovery plan shall be filed with the Court on or before 14 days after 7026(f) conference. Related [+]. Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2014 at 11:00 AM at Kalamazoo Courthouse. Signed on 6/12/2014 (kd)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Thomas C. Richardson
Wednesday, June 11, 2014
5 5 Answer to Complaint Filed by Broadriver Communications Corporation. (Olson, Erik)
Related: [-]
4 4 Answer to Complaint Filed by Pro Marketing Sales, Inc.. (Olson, Erik)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2014
3 3 Summons Service Executed on Broadriver Communications Corporation 4/28/2014; Pro Marketing Sales, Inc. 4/28/2014 (Piggins, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 Summons Issued on Broadriver Communications Corporation Date Issued 4/28/2014, Answer Due 5/28/2014; Pro Marketing Sales, Inc. Date Issued 4/28/2014, Answer Due 5/28/2014 (kac)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2014
1 1 Adversary case 14-80104 11 Related [+]) : Complaint by Thomas C. Richardson against Pro Marketing Sales, Inc., Broadriver Communications Corporation. Fee Amount of $293 is DEFERRED with Request to Defer by Plaintiff. (Piggins, John)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 542 turnover of property