Michigan Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott W Dales
Case #: 1:11-bk-12574
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2011
Creditor Meeting:Jun 11, 2013
Converted:Apr 20, 2013
Terminated:Jun 19, 2018
Plan Confirmed:Jun 20, 2012

Debtor
Priva Technologies, Inc.
1601 S DE Anza Blvd Ste 248
Cupertino, CA 95014-5350
Represented By
E. Todd Sable
Honigman Miller Schwartz And Cohn LLP
contact info
Joseph R. Sgroi
Honigman Miller Schwartz And Cohn LLP
contact info
Judy B. Calton
Honigman Miller Schwartz & Cohn
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Robert D. Wolford
Miller Johnson
contact info
Rachel L. Hillegonds
Miller Johnson
contact info
Thomas P. Sarb
Miller Johnson
contact info
Trustee
Thomas C. Richardson
PO Box 51067
Kalamazoo, MI 49005
Represented By
Rachel L. Hillegonds
Miller Johnson
contact info
John T. Piggins
Miller Johnson
contact info
Thomas P. Sarb
Miller Johnson
contact info
Trustee
Kelly M. Hagan
Hagan Law Offices, PLC P.O. Box 6844 www.trusteehagan.com
Traverse City, MI 49686
Represented By
Kevin M. Smith
Beadle Smith PLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Dean E. Rietberg
Trial Attorney Office of the US Trustee The Ledyard Building, 2nd Floor 125 Ottawa NW, Suite 200R
Grand Rapids, MI 49503


Docket last updated: 08/03/2015 5:14 PM EDT
Thursday, December 22, 2011
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 11-12574 [misc,volp11a] (1046.00). Receipt number 7736217, amount $1046.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Notice to Debtor(s) Counsel to File Conventionally with the Court Debtor(s) Declaration Re: ECF Within Seven Days from the Date of Filing or Case will be Dismissed Without Prejudice Pursuant to ECF Guidelines. To obtain a copy of this form, please go to: http://www.miwb.uscourts.gov/cms/assets/Rules-and-Forms/Rules/declarationecf.pdf (clp)
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1046 Filed by Priva Technologies, Inc. Schedules A-J due 01/5/2012. Summary of schedules due 01/5/2012. Declaration of Schedules due 01/5/2012. Statement of Financial Affairs due 01/5/2012. (Sgroi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
2 2 Emergency Motion for Joint Administration of: 11-12570 11-12574 11-12577 and 11-12578 Filed by Debtor Priva Technologies, Inc. (Sgroi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 Emergency Motion for Debtor-In-Possession Financing Filed by Debtor Priva Technologies, Inc. (Sgroi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Interim Order Authorizing Post Petition Financing
Att: 2 Exhibit B Summary
4 4 Emergency Motion to Deem Utilities Adequately Assured Pursuant to § 366b Re: Filed by Debtor Priva Technologies, Inc. (Sgroi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit List of Utility Providers
Att: 2 Proposed Order
5 5 Emergency Motion to Limit Notice to Create Special Mailing Matrix - Debtor's First-Day Motion for Authority to Limit Notice and Establish Notice Procedures Filed by Debtor Priva Technologies, Inc. (Sgroi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Authority to Limit Notice and Establish Notice Procedures
6 6 Chapter 11 First Day Motion - Debtors' Ex Parte Motion for Emergency Hearing Regarding First-Day Motions Filed by Debtor Priva Technologies, Inc. (Sgroi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Scheduling Emergency Hearing Regarding First-Day Motions
7 7 Chapter 11 First Day Motion - Declaration of William Sibert of Priva Technologies, Inc., in Support of Chapter 11 Petitions and First-Day Motions of Priva Technologies, Inc. and its Affiliated Debtors Filed by Debtor Priva Technologies, Inc. (Sgroi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
8 8 Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Debtor Priva Technologies, Inc. (Sgroi, Joseph)
Related: [-] 2 Emergency Motion for Joint Administration of: 11-12570 11-12574 11-12577 and 11-12578 3 Emergency Motion for Debtor-In-Possession Financing,4 Emergency Motion to Deem Utilities Adequately Assured Pursuant to § 366b Re:,5 Emergency Motion to Limit Notice to Create Special Mailing Matrix - Debtor's First-Day Motion for Authority to Limit Notice and Establish Notice Procedures ,6 Chapter 11 First Day Motion - Debtors' Ex Parte Motion for Emergency Hearing Regarding First-Day Motions ,7 Chapter 11 First Day Motion - Declaration of William Sibert of Priva Technologies, Inc., in Support of Chapter 11 Petitions and First-Day Motions of Priva Technologies, Inc. and its Affiliated Debtors
21 21 Notice of Filing(s) Due. Verification of Matrix due 1/5/2012. (dr)
Related: [-]