Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-23404

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:R Kimball Mosier
Case #: 2:20-ap-02046
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 07, 2020
Terminated:Jan 20, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
B&B Packaging Group, LLC
7701 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 850
St. Louis, MO 63105
Represented By
B&B Packaging Group, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth A. Rushton, Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Ellen E. Ostrow
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
30 30 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 11/20 3:57 PM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: Susan Knight. (Wride, Brent)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 04, 2022
court Receipt of Complaint Filing Fee Paid (FEE) Fri 02/04 9:00 PM
Receipt of Complaint Filing Fee Paid in Adversary Proceeding 20-02046 This fee was previously deferred. Receipt Number: 351658 Fee Amount: $350.00 (AT)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2021
29 29 generic BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order Fri 01/22 10:53 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order. Related [+] Notice Date 01/22/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Default Judgment
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
28 28 order Default Judgment (order) Wed 01/20 11:28 AM
Default Judgment Related [+] (gci)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Default Judgment
order Unsigned Order (order) Wed 01/20 11:27 AM
Unsigned Order Related [+]. Reason Order Was Unsigned: Alternate order to be entered by the Court. (gci)
Related: [-] 27 Pending Order filed by Ellen E. Ostrow
court Dispose Adversary Case Wed 01/20 3:32 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-2046 Disposed. (gci)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
27 27 misc Pending Order Tue 01/19 5:30 PM
Pending Order (Hearing Held) Re:17 Motion for Default Judgment. (Ostrow, Ellen)
Related: [-]
26 26 audio Tue 01/19 3:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/19/2021 2:06:27 PM ]. File Size [ 4731 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:09:51 ]. (Motion for Default Judgment). (admin)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry Tue 01/19 4:08 PM
Minute Entry Re:17 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Kenneth A. Rushton. Appearances: Ellen E. Ostrow (Atty/Tr); Kenneth Rushton (Tr). Matter taken under advisement. (tjc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2020
25 25 generic BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order Thu 12/17 11:07 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order. Related [+] Notice Date 12/17/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order to Continue Hearing
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
24 24 order Continue/Set Hearing - AP (order) Tue 12/15 3:47 PM
Order Setting Hearing on Motion for Default Judgment Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 1/19/2021 at 02:00 PM at RKM Teleconference Line. (djf)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Default Judgment
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
23 23 court Default Certificate Tue 12/01 11:01 AM
Default Certificate. (djf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
22 22 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/25 4:29 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Kenneth A. Rushton. (Ostrow, Ellen)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Default Judgment,18 Affidavit,19 Affidavit,20 Pending Default Certificate,21 Pending Order
21 21 misc Pending Order Wed 11/25 4:27 PM
Pending Order (Other) Re:17 Motion for Default Judgment. (Ostrow, Ellen)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Pending Default Certificate Wed 11/25 4:25 PM
Pending Default Certificate Filed by Kenneth A. Rushton. (Ostrow, Ellen)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Affidavit/Declaration Wed 11/25 4:23 PM
Affidavit/Declaration Related [+] Filed by Kenneth A. Rushton. (Ostrow, Ellen)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Default Judgment
18 18 misc Affidavit/Declaration Wed 11/25 4:21 PM
Affidavit/Declaration Related [+] (and Request for Default Certificate) Filed by Kenneth A. Rushton. (Ostrow, Ellen)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Default Judgment
Att: 1 Request for Default Certificate
17 17 motion Default Judgment (Motion) Wed 11/25 4:16 PM
Motion for Default Judgment (Application for Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendant) Filed by Kenneth A. Rushton. (Ostrow, Ellen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 14, 2020
16 16 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 10/14 10:10 AM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: B&B Packaging Group, LLC. (Ostrow, Ellen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
order Unsigned Order (order) Wed 09/23 11:43 AM
Unsigned Order Related [+]. Reason Order Was Unsigned: Moot. Default Certificate unsigned. (gci)
Related: [-] 14 Pending Order filed by Ellen E. Ostrow
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
generic Notice of Unsigned Default By Deputy Clerk Tue 09/22 1:09 PM
Notice of Unsigned Default By Deputy Clerk Related [+]. Reason. Service defects have not been rectified. Filed by Kenneth A. Rushton. (djf)
Related: [-] 13 Pending Default Certificate filed by Plaintiff Kenneth A. Rushton
Friday, September 18, 2020
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Fri 09/18 3:39 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Kenneth A. Rushton. (Ostrow, Ellen)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Default Judgment,11 Affidavit,12 Affidavit,13 Pending Default Certificate,14 Pending Order
14 14 misc Pending Order Fri 09/18 3:31 PM
Pending Order (Other) Re:10 Motion for Default Judgment. (Ostrow, Ellen)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Pending Default Certificate Fri 09/18 3:29 PM
Pending Default Certificate Filed by Kenneth A. Rushton. (Ostrow, Ellen)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Affidavit/Declaration Fri 09/18 3:25 PM
Affidavit/Declaration Related [+] Filed by Kenneth A. Rushton. (Ostrow, Ellen)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Default Judgment
11 11 misc Affidavit/Declaration Fri 09/18 3:23 PM
Affidavit/Declaration Related [+] (and Request for Default Certificate) Filed by Kenneth A. Rushton. (Ostrow, Ellen)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Default Judgment
Att: 1 Request for Default Certificate
10 10 motion Default Judgment (Motion) Fri 09/18 3:16 PM
Motion for Default Judgment (Application for Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendant) Filed by Kenneth A. Rushton. (Ostrow, Ellen)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2020
9 9 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 07/17 11:52 AM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: B&B Packaging Group, LLC. (Ostrow, Ellen)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2020
order Unsigned Order (order) Mon 07/13 12:06 PM
Unsigned Order Related [+]. Reason Order Was Unsigned: Moot. Default Certificate unsigned. (sjl)
Related: [-] 7 Pending Order filed by Ellen E. Ostrow
Thursday, July 02, 2020
generic Notice of Unsigned Default By Deputy Clerk Thu 07/02 11:05 AM
Notice of Unsigned Default By Deputy Clerk Related [+]. Reason. Insufficient service. Filed by Kenneth A. Rushton. (djf)
Related: [-] 6 Pending Default Certificate filed by Plaintiff Kenneth A. Rushton
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/01 12:04 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Kenneth A. Rushton. (Ostrow, Ellen)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for Default Judgment,4 Affidavit,5 Affidavit,6 Pending Default Certificate,7 Pending Order
7 7 misc Pending Order Wed 07/01 12:03 PM
Pending Order (Other) Re:3 Motion for Default Judgment. (Ostrow, Ellen)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Pending Default Certificate Wed 07/01 11:50 AM
Pending Default Certificate Filed by Kenneth A. Rushton. (Ostrow, Ellen)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Affidavit/Declaration Wed 07/01 11:31 AM
Affidavit/Declaration Related [+] Filed by Kenneth A. Rushton. (Ostrow, Ellen)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for Default Judgment
4 4 misc Affidavit/Declaration Wed 07/01 11:29 AM
Affidavit/Declaration Related [+] (and Request for Entry of Default Certificate) Filed by Kenneth A. Rushton. (Ostrow, Ellen)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for Default Judgment
Att: 1 Request for Default Certificate
3 3 motion Default Judgment (Motion) Wed 07/01 11:18 AM
Motion for Default Judgment (Application for Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendant) Filed by Kenneth A. Rushton. (Ostrow, Ellen)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 18, 2020
2 2 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 05/18 4:00 PM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: B&B Packaging Group, LLC. (Ostrow, Ellen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/07 3:31 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK 20-02046 . Complaint by Kenneth A. Rushton against B&B Packaging Group, LLC. Fee Amount $350. Payment Not Due at this Time: Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit(s): [12 Related [+], 13, 14]. (Ostrow, Ellen)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other