Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:R Kimball Mosier
Case #: 2:18-bk-23404
Case Filed:May 11, 2018
Creditor Meeting:Apr 11, 2019
Claims Deadline:Jun 27, 2019
Converted:Mar 08, 2019
Terminated:Mar 23, 2022

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Food For Health International, LLC
3250 W Professional Cir
Salt Lake City, UT 84104-4524
Represented By
Gregory J. Adams
Mckay Burton & Thurman
contact info
Jeremy C. Sink
Mckay Burton & Thurman
contact info
Mark C. Rose
Mckay, Burton & Thurman, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Holland & Hart LLP 222 South Main Street, Ste. 2200
Salt Lake City, UT 84101
Represented By
Sherilyn A. Olsen
Holland & Hart
contact info
Ellen E. Ostrow
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
Trustee
Kenneth A. Rushton tr
P.O. Box 212
Lehi, UT 84043
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Washington Federal Bldg. 405 South Main Street Suite 300
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
Peter J. Kuhn tr
Us Trustees Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/27/2019 8:33 AM MDT
Friday, May 11, 2018
court List of Creditors (Matrix) Upload Fri 05/11 10:28 AM
Creditor(s) uploaded (164 creditors). (Sink, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
crditcrd PayGov Receipt of Fee Due Fri 05/11 10:31 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-23404 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 20866499, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice (No Image) Fri 05/11 1:46 PM
Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice. Filed by Food For Health International, LLC. (Adams, Gregory)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice (No Image) Fri 05/11 1:47 PM
Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice. Filed by Food For Health International, LLC. (Rose, Mark)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice (No Image) Fri 05/11 1:59 PM
Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice. Filed by United States Trustee. (Kuhn tr, Peter)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (FEE) Fri 05/11 10:28 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Food For Health International, LLC. (Sink, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
2 2 genaty Equity Security Holders Fri 05/11 10:39 AM
Equity Security Holders. Filed by Food For Health International, LLC. (Sink, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Fri 05/11 10:42 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Food For Health International, LLC. (Sink, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs genaty 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Fri 05/11 10:42 AM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Food For Health International, LLC. (Sink, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Affidavit/Declaration Fri 05/11 10:44 AM
Affidavit/Declaration Verification of Creditor Matrix Filed by Food For Health International, LLC. (Sink, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
6 6 genaty Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Fri 05/11 10:45 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (per BR 2016). Filed by Food For Health International, LLC. (Sink, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Employ Professional (Motion) Fri 05/11 1:15 PM
Application to Employ McKay, Burton & Thurman, P.C. as Attorney Filed by Food For Health International, LLC. (Sink, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Affidavit/Declaration Fri 05/11 1:21 PM
Affidavit/Declaration Related [+] Filed by Food For Health International, LLC. (Sink, Jeremy)
Related: [-] 7 Application to Employ (Professional)
9 9 misc Pending Order Fri 05/11 1:43 PM
Pending Order (Ex Parte) related documents(s):7 Application to Employ (Professional) Filed by: (Sink, Jeremy)
Related: [-]