Member Case
Lead case is: 1:14-bk-10979

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:14-bk-10978
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2014
Terminated:Aug 07, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of CreditorsOver 100,000
Est. AssetsMore than $1 billion
Est. Liabilities More than $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Texas Competitive Electric Holdings Company LLC
Energy Plaza 1601 Bryan Street
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Daniel J. DeFranceschi
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Tyler D. Semmelman
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Jason M. Madron
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims Agent
Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC
www.epiqsystems.com 757 Third Ave Third Floor
New York, NY 10017
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Richard L. Schepacarter
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Thursday, March 31, 2022
26 26 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Thu 03/31 5:36 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Angharad Bowdler of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC (Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on March 28, 2022 starting at 11:00 a.m. (EDT)) Related [+] Filed by Texas Competitive Electric Holdings Company LLC. (Madron, Jason)
Related: [-] 24
25 25 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Thu 03/31 5:32 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Angharad Bowdler of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+] Filed by Texas Competitive Electric Holdings Company LLC. (Madron, Jason)
Related: [-] 20 ,23
Friday, March 25, 2022
24 24 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Fri 03/25 12:21 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Texas Competitive Electric Holdings Company LLC. Hearing scheduled for 3/28/2022 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Madron, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
23 23 3 pgs order Order Thu 03/24 6:22 PM
ORDER (I) REOPENING CHAPTER 11 CASE OF TEXASCOMPETITIVE ELECTRIC HOLDINGS COMPANY, LLC,(II) ENTERING AND APPROVING THE STIPULATION AND ORDER,AND (III) ENTERING A FINAL DECREE CLOSING CHAPTER 11 CASE Related [+] Order Signed on 3/24/2022. (CAS)
Related: [-] 14
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
22 22 misc Certificate of No Objection Thu 03/24 5:17 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding "Reorganized TCEH Debtor's Motion for an Order (I) Reopening Chapter 11 Case, (II) Entering and Approving the Stipulation and Order, and (III) Entering a Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Case" [D.I. 14] Related [+] Filed by Texas Competitive Electric Holdings Company LLC. (Madron, Jason)
Related: [-] 14
21 21 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Thu 03/24 4:16 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service Angharad Bowdler of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC (Notice of "Reorganized TCEH Debtor's Motion for an Order (I) Reopening Chapter 11 Case, (II) Entering and Approving the Stipulation and Order, and (III) Entering a Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Case" and Hearing Thereon) Related [+] Filed by Texas Competitive Electric Holdings Company LLC. (Madron, Jason)
Related: [-] 18
20 20 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice Thu 03/24 11:54 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Texas Competitive Electric Holdings Company LLC. Hearing scheduled for 3/28/2022 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Madron, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
19 19 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Wed 03/16 11:50 AM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Angharad Bowdler of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+] Filed by Texas Competitive Electric Holdings Company LLC. (Madron, Jason)
Related: [-] 14 ,15
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
18 18 notice Hearing - Notice Tue 03/15 11:07 AM
Notice of Hearing (Notice of "Reorganized TCEH Debtor's Motion for an Order (I) Reopening Chapter 11 Case, (II) Entering and Approving the Stipulation and Order, and (III) Entering a Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Case" and Hearing Thereon) Related [+] Filed by Texas Competitive Electric Holdings Company LLC. Hearing scheduled for 3/28/2022 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 3/23/2022. (Madron, Jason)
Related: [-] 14 ,15 ,17
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, March 14, 2022
17 17 order Shorten Time Mon 03/14 3:42 PM
ORDER SHORTENING NOTICE AND SETTING RESPONSE AND OBJECTION DEADLINES Related [+] Order Signed on 3/14/2022. (DRG)
Related: [-] 15
16 16 crditcrd none Mon 03/14 11:03 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Reopen Chapter 11 Case (B)([LINK 14-10978 CSS] ) [motion,mopen11] (1167.00). Receipt Number A10666816, amount $1167.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 11, 2022
15 15 motion Shorten - Motion Fri 03/11 7:18 PM
Motion to Shorten Related [+] Filed by Texas Competitive Electric Holdings Company LLC. (Madron, Jason)
Related: [-] organized TCEH Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order Shortening Notice and Setting Response and Objection Deadlines14
Att: 1 Exhibit A
14 14 motion Reopen Chapter 11 Case - Motion Fri 03/11 7:13 PM
Motion to Reopen Chapter 11 Case Related [+] . Fee Amount $1167. Filed by Texas Competitive Electric Holdings Company LLC. Hearing scheduled for 3/28/2022 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 3/23/2022. (Madron, Jason)
Related: [-] organized TCEH Debtor's Motion for an Order (I) Reopening Chapter 11 Case, (II) Entering and Approving the Stipulation and Order, and (III) Entering a Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Case
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Friday, August 07, 2020
13 13 4 pgs order Order Fri 08/07 12:01 PM
Order Closing Case. Signed on 8/7/2020. (Murin, Leslie)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 08/07 12:02 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (Murin, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 26, 2014
12 12 misc Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity Fri 09/26 8:27 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch B, Sch D, Sch F, , Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Texas Competitive Electric Holdings Company LLC. (Romanowicz, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 28, 2014
11 11 misc List of Creditors Mon 07/28 11:27 PM
List of Creditors (Notice of Filing of Non-Consolidated Creditor Matrix of Texas Competition Electirc Holdings Company LLC (Case No. 14-10978 ) Filed by Texas Competitive Electric Holdings Company LLC. (Madron, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, June 30, 2014
10 10 misc Schedules/Statements Mon 06/30 8:00 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , ,. Filed by Texas Competitive Electric Holdings Company LLC. (Semmelman, Tyler)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Schedules/Statements Mon 06/30 6:14 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Texas Competitive Electric Holdings Company LLC. (Semmelman, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 05, 2014
8 8 order Order-Joint Admin Thu 06/05 6:44 PM
Order (FINAL) Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. Order Signed on 6/5/14 (LB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2014
7 7 Order (INTERIM) Directing Joint Administration of The Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. Order Signed on 5/1/2014. An Order Has Been Entered Directing The Joint Administration of The Chapter 11 Cases of Energy Future Holdings Corp.; Texas Competitive Electric Holdings Company LLC; 4Change Energy Company; 4Change Energy Holdings LLC; Big Brown 3 Power Company LLC; Big Brown Lignite Company LLC; Big Brown Power Company LLC; Brighten Energy LLC; Brighten Holdings LLC; Collin Power Company LLC; Dallas Power & Light Company, Inc.; DeCordova II Power Company LLC; DeCordova Power Company LLC; Eagle Mountain Power Company LLC; Ebasco Services of Canada Limited; EEC Holdings, Inc.; EECI, Inc.; EFH Australia (No.2) Holdings Company; EFH CG Holdings Company LP; EFH CG Management Company LLC; EFH Corporate Services Company; EFH Finance (No.2) Holdings Company; EFH FS Holdings Company; EFH Renewables Company LLC; EFIH Finance Inc.; Energy Future Competitive Holdings Company LLC; Energy Future Intermediate Holding Company LLC; Generation Development Company LLC; Generation MT Company LLC; Generation SVC Company; Lake Creek 3 Power Company LLC; Lone Star Energy Company, Inc.; Lone Star Pipeline Company, Inc.; LSGT Gas Company LLC; LSGT SACROC, Inc.; Luminant Big Brown Mining Company LLC; Luminant Energy Company LLC; Luminant Energy Trading California Company; Luminant ET Services Company; Luminant Generation Company LLC; Luminant Holding Company LLC; Luminant Mineral Development Company LLC; Luminant Mining Company LLC; Luminant Renewables Company LLC; Martin Lake 4 Power Company LLC; Monticello 4 Power Company LLC; Morgan Creek 7 Power Company LLC; NCA Development Company LLC; NCA Resources Development Company LLC; Oak Grove Management Company LLC; Oak Grove Mining Company LLC; Oak Grove Power Company LLC; Sandow Power Company LLC; Southwestern Electric Service Company, Inc.; TCEH Finance, Inc,; Texas Electric Service Company, Inc,; Texas Energy Industries Company, Inc,; Texas Power & Light Company, Inc.; Texas Utilities Company, Inc.; Texas Utilities Electric Company, Inc.; Tradinghouse 3 & 4 Power Company LLC; Tradinghouse Power Company LLC; TXU Electric Company, Inc.; TXU Energy Receivables Company; TXU Energy Retail Company LLC; TXU Energy Solutions Company LLC; TXU Receivables Company; TXU Retail Services Company; TXU SEM Company; Valley NG Power Company LLC; Valley Power Company LLC. All Further Pleadings And Other Papers Shall Be Filed In, And All Further Docket Entries Shall Be Made In, Case No. 14-10979 (JohnstonJ, Julie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2014
6 6 38 pgs Objection / Preliminary Objection of the Ad Hoc Group of TCEH Unsecured Noteholders to the Motion of the TCEH Debtors for Entry of an Order Directing Joint Administration of Their Chapter 11 Cases With Those of the Oncor Debtors Related [+] Filed by Ad Hoc Group of TCEH Unsecured Noteholders (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, April 29, 2014
5 5 Motion for Joint Administration Filed by 4Change Energy Company, 4Change Energy Holdings LLC, Big Brown 3 Power Company LLC, Big Brown Lignite Company LLC, Big Brown Power Company LLC, Brighten Energy LLC, Brighten Holdings LLC, DeCordova Power Company LLC, EBASCO SERVICES OF CANADA LIMITED, EEC Holdings, Inc., EECI, Inc., EFH Australia (No. 2) Holdings Company, EFH Corporate Services Company, Eagle Mountain Power Company LLC, Energy Future Holdings Corp., TXU Electric Company, Inc., TXU Energy Receivables Company LLC, TXU Energy Retail Company LLC, Texas Competitive Electric Holdings Company LLC, Tradinghouse Power Company LLC. (Madron, Jason)
Related: [-]
4 4 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 14-10978 [misc,volp11a] (1213.00). Receipt Number 7056983, amount $1213.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
3 3 Appendix to Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1408 & 1412 and Rule 1014 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure to Transfer Cases to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas Related [+] Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Indenture Trustee. (Bowden, William)
Related: [-] 2
Att: 1 Part 2
Att: 2 Part 3
Att: 3 Part 4
Att: 4 Part 5
2 2 28 pgs Motion to Change Venue/Inter-district Transfer - Bankruptcy // Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1408 & 1412 and Rule 1014 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure to Transfer Cases to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Indenture Trustee. (Bowden, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
1 1 30+ pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1213. Filed by Texas Competitive Electric Holdings Company LLC. (DeFranceschi, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Judge Christopher S. Sontchi added to case (JohnstonJ, Julie)
Related: [-]
Attorney Richard Schepacarter added to case (Filed by United States Trustee).
Related: [-]