Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-23404

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:R Kimball Mosier
Case #: 2:20-ap-02047
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:May 11, 2020
Terminated:Mar 24, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cintas Corporation
Represented By
Cintas Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth A. Rushton
Represented By
Adam S. Affleck
Richards Brandt Miller Nelson
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, February 04, 2022
court Receipt of Complaint Filing Fee Paid (FEE) Fri 02/04 9:00 PM
Receipt of Complaint Filing Fee Paid in Adversary Proceeding 20-02047 This fee was previously deferred. Receipt Number: 351658 Fee Amount: $350.00 (AT)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 26, 2021
4 4 generic Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings Fri 03/26 11:14 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings Notice Date 03/26/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
3 3 notice Notice of Dismissal Wed 03/24 1:01 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Kenneth A. Rushton. (Affleck, Adam)
Related: [-]
order Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution (order) Wed 03/24 9:18 AM
Order to Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution. Response Due 4/13/2021. (skr)
Related: [-]
court Dispose Adversary Case Wed 03/24 1:26 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-2047 Disposed. (gci)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 01, 2020
2 2 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 06/01 11:33 AM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: Lindsey Larsen. (Affleck, Adam)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
notice Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice (No Image) Fri 05/29 5:08 PM
Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice. Filed by Kenneth A. Rushton. (Leonard, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 11, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/11 3:36 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK 20-02047 . Complaint by Kenneth A. Rushton against Cintas Corporation. Fee Amount $350. Payment Not Due at this Time: Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit(s): [12 Related [+]]. (Affleck, Adam)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference