Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-23404

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:R Kimball Mosier
Case #: 2:20-ap-02048
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:May 11, 2020
Terminated:Mar 24, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Zions First National Bank
Represented By
Zions First National Bank
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth A. Rushton
Represented By
Adam S. Affleck
Richards Brandt Miller Nelson
contact info
Plaintiff
Richards Brandt Miller Nelson
Represented By
Adam S. Affleck
Richards Brandt Miller Nelson
contact info


Docket last updated: 47 minutes ago
Friday, February 04, 2022
court Receipt of Complaint Filing Fee Paid (FEE) Fri 02/04 9:00 PM
Receipt of Complaint Filing Fee Paid in Adversary Proceeding 20-02048 This fee was previously deferred. Receipt Number: 351658 Fee Amount: $350.00 (AT)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 26, 2021
4 4 generic Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings Fri 03/26 11:14 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Miscellaneous Pleadings Notice Date 03/26/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
3 3 notice Notice of Dismissal Wed 03/24 1:03 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Kenneth A. Rushton. (Affleck, Adam)
Related: [-]
order Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution (order) Wed 03/24 9:18 AM
Order to Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution. Response Due 4/13/2021. (skr)
Related: [-]
court Dispose Adversary Case Wed 03/24 1:28 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-2048 Disposed. (gci)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 01, 2020
2 2 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 06/01 11:37 AM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: Lindsey Larsen. (Affleck, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 11, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/11 3:44 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK 20-02048 . Complaint by Kenneth A. Rushton, Richards Brandt Miller Nelson against Zions First National Bank. Fee Amount $350. Payment Not Due at this Time: Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit(s): [12 Related [+]]. (Affleck, Adam)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference