Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:18-bk-13774

Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Magdeline D Coleman
Case #: 4:20-ap-00158
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:May 12, 2020
Terminated:Oct 19, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
R.E. Michel Company, LLC
One R.E. Michel Drive
Glen Burnie, MD 21060
Plaintiff
CHRISTINE C. SHUBERT, Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estates of WORLEY & OBETZ, INC., et al.
Represented By
ROBERT W. SEITZER
Karalis PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 87 minutes ago
Monday, October 19, 2020
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 10/19 8:14 AM
Disposition of Adversary 4:20-ap-158 Settled. (W., Christine)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 10/19 8:14 AM
Adversary Case 4:20-ap-158 Terminated for Statistical Purposes. (W., Christine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 29, 2020
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 07/30 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 07/29/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #8 )
Monday, July 27, 2020
8 8 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Mon 07/27 8:18 AM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 between the Trustee and the Defendant. Related [+] (W., Christine)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, July 15, 2020
7 7 court Hearing Held Wed 07/15 11:18 AM
Hearing Held on4 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 between the Trustee and the Defendant Filed by CHRISTINE C. SHUBERT Represented by ROBERT W. SEITZER (Counsel). Related [+]. ORDER to be entered (G., Eileen)
Related: [-] ,4
Thursday, July 02, 2020
6 6 misc Certificate of No Response Thu 07/02 12:35 PM
Certificate of No Response to Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 between the Trustee and the Defendant Filed by ROBERT W. SEITZER on behalf of CHRISTINE C. SHUBERT Related [+]. (SEITZER, ROBERT)
Related: [-] 4
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, June 17, 2020
5 5 notice Notice of Motion Wed 06/17 11:41 AM
Notice of Related [+] Filed by CHRISTINE C. SHUBERT. Hearing scheduled 7/15/2020 at 10:30 AM at nix2 - Courtroom #2. (SEITZER, ROBERT)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 between the Trustee and the Defendant
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
4 4 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Wed 06/17 11:40 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 between the Trustee and the Defendant Filed by CHRISTINE C. SHUBERT Represented by ROBERT W. SEITZER (Counsel). (SEITZER, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, May 13, 2020
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 05/13 2:17 PM
Summons Service Executed on R.E. Michel Company, LLC 5/13/2020 . (SEITZER, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 05/13 9:39 AM
1 Summons Issued to Plaintiff(s) to be served upon Defendant(s) R.E. Michel Company, LLC Date Issued 5/13/2020, Answer Due 6/12/2020. (W., Christine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 12, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/12 4:07 PM
Adversary case 20-00158 Complaint by ROBERT W. SEITZER on behalf of CHRISTINE C. SHUBERT against R.E. Michel Company, LLC. Fee Amount $0.00 . (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (SEITZER, ROBERT)
Related: [-]