Member Case
Lead case is: 2:20-bk-05017

Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Daniel P Collins
Case #: 2:20-bk-05020
Case Filed:May 13, 2020
Terminated:Apr 28, 2022

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
ALAMO GILBERT LLC
519 E Horseshoe Pl
Chandler, AZ 85249-3098
Represented By
WESLEY DENTON RAY
Sacks Tierney P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE SUITE 204
PHOENIX, AZ 85003


Docket last updated: 43 minutes ago
Thursday, April 28, 2022
36 36 order oFinal Decree (Closes Case) Thu 04/28 11:49 AM
Final Decree (Case Closed) signed on 4/28/2022 . (SJF)
Related: [-]
35 35 other Small Business Monthly Operating Report Thu 04/28 9:08 AM
Final Small Business Monthly Operating Report For March 2022 filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC. (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 04, 2022
34 34 other Post-Confirmation Report Fri 03/04 10:08 AM
Post-Confirmation Report. // Quarter Ending December 31, 2021 filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC. (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 03, 2021
33 33 other Small Business Monthly Operating Report Wed 11/03 12:05 PM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report For September 2021 filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC. (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
32 32 other Small Business Monthly Operating Report Wed 11/03 12:03 PM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report For August 2021 filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC. (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
31 31 other Small Business Monthly Operating Report Wed 11/03 11:34 AM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report For July 2021 filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC. (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 06, 2021
30 30 other Small Business Monthly Operating Report Fri 08/06 2:12 PM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report For June 2021 filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC. (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
29 29 other Small Business Monthly Operating Report Tue 07/06 8:53 AM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report For May 2021 filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC. (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 07, 2021
28 28 other Operating Report Mon 06/07 4:15 PM
Monthly Operating Report For April 2021 filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC. (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 25, 2021
27 27 other Operating Report Sun 04/25 9:01 AM
Monthly Operating Report For March 2021 filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC. (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 08, 2021
26 26 other Operating Report Thu 04/08 11:11 AM
Monthly Operating Report For February 2021 filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC. (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
25 25 other Operating Report Tue 03/02 12:46 PM
Monthly Operating Report For January 2021 filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC. (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
24 24 other Operating Report Wed 02/17 12:54 PM
Monthly Operating Report For December 2020 filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC. (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 21, 2020
23 23 other Operating Report Mon 12/21 12:49 PM
Operating Report For Nov. 2020 filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC. (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2020
22 22 other Operating Report Mon 11/23 1:09 PM
Operating Report For Oct 2020 filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC. (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2020
21 21 other Operating Report Mon 10/26 10:59 AM
Operating Report For September, 2020 - Gilbert filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC. (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2020
20 20 other Operating Report Thu 09/24 7:59 AM
Operating Report For August, 2020 filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC. (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2020
19 19 other Operating Report Mon 08/17 2:22 PM
Operating Report For July, 2020 filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC. (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 15, 2020
18 18 other Operating Report Wed 07/15 4:07 PM
Operating Report For June, 2020 filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC.(RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit Financial Report
Att: 3 Exhibit DIP Statements
Friday, June 26, 2020
17 17 other Operating Report Fri 06/26 1:40 PM
Operating Report For May, 2020 filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC.(RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit E - Total Payables
Att: 2 Exhibit Financial Report
Att: 3 Exhibit DIP Statement
Att: 4 Exhibit Pre-petition Bank Statement
Thursday, June 25, 2020
16 16 other Amendment to Mailing List (31.00 fee) Thu 06/25 1:41 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors , Summary of Schedules , Amendment to Schedules (A/B,C,G,H,I,J) A/B and G , Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/31.00 Fee) D and E/F , Amendment to Mailing List (31.00 fee) filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC. Related [+] (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11),14 Schedules and Statements
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment Thu 06/25 1:41 PM
Receipt of Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/31.00 Fee)(2:20-bk-05020-DPC) [other,1229] ( 31.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 32854281. Fee amount 31.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment Thu 06/25 1:41 PM
Receipt of Amendment to Mailing List (31.00 fee)(2:20-bk-05020-DPC) [other,1559] ( 31.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 32854281. Fee amount 31.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2020
15 15 trustee Minutes of 341 Meeting Tue 06/16 1:38 PM
First Minutes of 341 Meeting Held 6/16/2020 @ 9:30 a.m. by Jennifer Giaimo filed by U.S. TRUSTEE.(Griffiths, Dale)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2020
14 14 other AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required) Wed 05/27 4:14 PM
Schedules and Statements for Non-Individual filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC. (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
13 13 other List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors Wed 05/27 12:13 PM
Amended List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC. (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
12 12 other Certificate of Service Wed 05/27 10:12 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Bankruptcy Portfolio. (Bryant, Renee)
Related: [-]
11 11 claims Request for Notice Wed 05/27 10:07 AM
Request for Notice filed by JORDAN HOPKINS. (Bryant, Renee)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2020
10 10 court zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE) Sat 05/23 9:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Corp/Part
9 9 court BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Corp/Part Thu 05/21 10:32 AM
Chapter 11 Corp/Part Notice of Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/16/2020 at 09:30 AM as a Telephonic Hearing (341) Proof of Claims due by 7/22/2020, (Purvis, Andamo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 19, 2020
8 8 court Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Wed 05/20 10:08 AM
Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (Medina, Diane)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 15, 2020
7 7 court ~Generic~ NOTICE Fri 05/15 8:55 AM
An order has been entered authorizing the joint administration of this case with Case No. 2:20-bk-05017-DPC. With the exception of schedules, statements of financial affairs, proofs of claims or interests, and monthly operating reports, which may be filed in this case, all pleadings, papers, and documents filed in the debtors bankruptcy case shall use the consolidated caption approved in that order and shall be filed and docketed in Case No. 2:20-bk-05017-DPC. (Vargas, Rosario)
Related: [-]
6 6 order oJoint Administration Fri 05/15 8:47 AM
ORDER for Joint Administration signed on 5/15/2020 . (Vargas, Rosario)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 14, 2020
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment Thu 05/14 11:13 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(2:20-bk-05020) [other,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 32713726. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 13, 2020
5 5 court Meeting of Creditors 11 (Business) Wed 05/13 11:50 PM
Meeting of Creditors scheduled for 06/16/2020 at 09:30 AM at US Trustee Meeting Room, 230 N. First Avenue, Suite 102, Phoenix, AZ (341-PHX). (Admin, Admin)
Related: [-]
4 4 other Declaration Wed 05/13 2:52 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC. Related [+] (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
3 3 other Initial Mailing List Wed 05/13 2:47 PM
Master Mailing List filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC. (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
2 2 3 pgs other List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors Wed 05/13 2:37 PM
List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC. (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs other 2Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (1717.00 fee) Wed 05/13 2:30 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements (except for those listed below). Failure to timely upload the list of creditors, may result in dismissal of the case without further notice. Electronic Filing Declaration due 06/3/2020, Master Mailing due 05/20/2020, Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 08/11/2020. Schedules A/B-J due 05/27/2020. Statement of Financial Affairs due 05/27/2020, Attorney Disclosure Statement due 05/27/2020, Chapter 11 Statement of Current Monthly Income due by 05/27/2020, Payment Advices Declaration Required by 11 USC Section 521(a)(1)(B)(iv) due by 05/27/2020, filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO GILBERT LLC (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]