Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Daniel P Collins
Case #: 2:20-bk-05017
Case Filed:May 13, 2020
Terminated:Apr 28, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Aug 19, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
ALAMO CHANDLER LLC
519 E Horseshoe Pl
Chandler, AZ 85249-3098
Represented By
WESLEY DENTON RAY
Sacks Tierney P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE SUITE 204
PHOENIX, AZ 85003

Docket last updated: 28 minutes ago
Thursday, April 28, 2022
310 310 order oFinal Decree (Closes Case) Thu 04/28 11:47 AM
Final Decree (Case Closed) signed on 4/28/2022 Related [+] . (SJF)
Related: [-] 303 Notice of Substantial Consummation
309 309 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Thu 04/28 10:07 AM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order // Final Decree and Order Closing Cases filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO CHANDLER LLC Related [+].(RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-] 303 Notice of Substantial Consummation,308 Certificate of Service and No Objections
308 308 other Certificate of Service and No Objections Thu 04/28 9:58 AM
Certificate of Service and No Objections filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO CHANDLER LLC. Related [+] (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-] 303 Notice of Substantial Consummation,304 Notice of Bar Date
307 307 other Small Business Monthly Operating Report Thu 04/28 9:00 AM
Final Small Business Monthly Operating Report For March 2022 filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of ALAMO CHANDLER LLC. (RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]