Consolidated
Lead case: 1:14-md-02543

New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jesse M Furman
Case #: 1:20-cv-03732
Nature of Suit355 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause28:1332md Diversity-Motor Vehicle/Wrongful Death
Case Filed:May 14, 2020
Terminated:Dec 12, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 10, 2020 3:54 AM EST
Defendant
General Motors L.L.C.
Plaintiff
Norma Robinson
Represented By
Jason Wells Fernandez
Greenberg And Bederman LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, April 21, 2023
106 106 appeal USCA Mandate Fri 04/21 3:09 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to104 Notice of Appeal filed by Norma Robinson USCA Case Number 23-0044 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the appeal is dismissed effective March 22, 2023 unless by that date appellant either pays the fee in full, moves for in forma pauperis status in district court or, if district court has denied in forma pauperis status, moves in this Court for in forma pauperis status. If appellant has filed the motion in district court and the motion is pending, appellant must so advise this Court in writing by the same date. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 4/21/2023..(tp)
Related: [-]
appeal Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge Fri 04/21 3:10 PM
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re:106 USCA Mandate. (tp)
Related: [-]