Original Case: 1:20-cv-03732

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-00044
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit355 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2023
Terminated:Mar 31, 2023
Last checked: Monday Apr 03, 2023 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
General Motors L.L.C.
Represented By
Andrew Baker Bloomer
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Wendy L. Bloom
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gary Peller
Plaintiff - Appellant
Norma Robinson, as Administrator of The Estate Cleon Davis
Represented By
Norma Robinson
-
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/03/2023 4:29 AM EDT
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Norma Robinson, FILED. [3451108] [23-44] [Entered: 01/12/2023 08:51 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 42 pgs Case FILED
2 2 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 12/12/2022, RECEIVED.[3451113] [23-44] [Entered: 01/12/2023 08:55 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3451116] [23-44] [Entered: 01/12/2023 08:55 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 35 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED