New York Northern District Court
Judge:Frederick J Scullin, Jr
Referred: Andrew T Baxter
Case #: 6:20-cv-00539
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 American Disabilities Act
Case Filed:May 12, 2020
Terminated:Sep 19, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Nov 08, 2020 5:25 AM EST
Defendant
Central New York Regional Transportation Authority
Represented By
Christian P. Jones
Mackenzie Hughes LLP
contact info
Defendant
Centro of Oneida, Inc.
Represented By
Christian P. Jones
Mackenzie Hughes LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Travis Woods
Represented By
Andrew D. Bizer
Bizer & Dereus
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
City of Utica
Terminated: 07/28/2020
Represented By
Zachary Oren
City Of Utica - Corporation Counsel
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
appeal USCA Case Number Wed 07/10 1:41 PM
USCA Case Number 22-2629 for43 Notice of Appeal filed by Travis Woods. Related [+]
Related: [-] p
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
45 45 appeal USCA Mandate Wed 07/03 9:44 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to43 Notice of Appeal filed by Travis Woods. Mandate issued on 7/2/2024. (sbb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
44 44 appeal Electronic Notice and Certification to USCA of Appeal Mon 10/03 10:21 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE AND CERTIFICATION sent to US Court of Appeals re43 Notice of Appeal. (mgh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
43 43 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 09/29 4:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to42 Judgment,41 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, by Travis Woods. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ANYNDC-6052464. (Bizer, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
42 42 order Judgment Mon 09/19 11:30 AM
JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED, that Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, DENIED; and the Court further ORDERS that Defendants' motion for summary judgment, is GRANTED and Plaintiff's complaint, is DISMISSED. Pursuant to the order of the Honorable Judge Frederick J. Scullin, dated the 19th day of September, 2022. (mgh)
Related: [-]
41 41 14 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Mon 09/19 11:12 AM
MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERS that Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, see Dkt. No.33 , is DENIED; and the Court further ORDERS that Defendants' motion for summary judgment, see Dkt. No.32 , is GRANTED and Plaintiff's complaint, see Dkt. No.1 , is DISMISSED; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in Defendants' favor and close this case. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr on 9/19/2022. (mgh)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
40 40 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 10/22 3:51 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re32 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Central New York Regional Transportation Authority, Centro of Oneida, Inc.. Motion returnable before Judge Hon. Federick Scullin. filed by Central New York Regional Transportation Authority, Centro of Oneida, Inc.. (Hunt, William)
Related: [-]
39 39 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 10/22 2:43 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re33 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Travis Woods. Motion returnable before Judge Hon. Frederick J. Scullin. filed by Travis Woods. (Bizer, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 15, 2021
38 38 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 10/15 4:00 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re33 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Travis Woods. Motion returnable before Judge Hon. Frederick J. Scullin. filed by Central New York Regional Transportation Authority, Centro of Oneida, Inc..(Hunt, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Material Facts
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
37 37 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/13 5:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Garret S. DeReus on behalf of Travis Woods (DeReus, Garret)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
order Order on Letter Request Tue 10/12 3:00 PM
TEXT ORDER granting35 Letter Request for an extension of time to file response and reply to33 MOTION for Summary Judgment and reply to34 Response to32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Response to motion now due by 10/15/2021. Replies to Response to both motions now due by 10/22/2021. IT IS SO ORDERED by Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr on 10/12/2021. (bjw, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
35 35 motion Letter Request/Motion Fri 10/08 4:39 PM
Letter Motion from W. Bradley Hunt, Esq. for Central New York Regional Transportation Authority, Centro of Oneida, Inc. requesting one-week extension of time to file our papers in opposition to Plaintiff's summary judgment motion submitted to Judge Hon. Federick Scullin . (Hunt, William)
Related: [-]
34 34 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 10/08 3:34 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re32 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Central New York Regional Transportation Authority, Centro of Oneida, Inc.. Motion returnable before Judge Hon. Federick Scullin. filed by Travis Woods.(Bizer, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Material Facts
Friday, September 17, 2021
33 33 motion Summary Judgment Fri 09/17 3:40 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Travis Woods. Motion returnable before Judge Hon. Frederick J. Scullin. Response to Motion due by 10/8/2021. Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/15/2021 (Bizer, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law,
Att: 2 Statement of Material Facts,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) E,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) F,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) G,
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) H,
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) I,
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) J,
Att: 13 Exhibit(s) K,
Att: 14 Exhibit(s) L,
Att: 15 Exhibit(s) M,
Att: 16 Exhibit(s) N,
Att: 17 Exhibit(s) O
32 32 motion Summary Judgment Fri 09/17 12:50 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Central New York Regional Transportation Authority, Centro of Oneida, Inc.. Motion returnable before Judge Hon. Federick Scullin. Response to Motion due by 10/8/2021. Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/15/2021 (Hunt, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) E,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) F,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) G,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) H,
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) I,
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) J,
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) K,
Att: 13 Exhibit(s) L,
Att: 14 Exhibit(s) M,
Att: 15 Exhibit(s) N,
Att: 16 Exhibit(s) O,
Att: 17 Exhibit(s) P,
Att: 18 Exhibit(s) Q,
Att: 19 Exhibit(s) R,
Att: 20 Exhibit(s) S,
Att: 21 Affidavit,
Att: 22 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 23 Affidavit,
Att: 24 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 25 Affidavit,
Att: 26 Memorandum of Law,
Att: 27 Statement of Material Facts
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 09/07 12:26 PM
TEXT ORDER granting30 Consent MOTION for an extension of the motion filing deadline and to file an enlarged brief filed by Travis Woods. Motions to be filed by 9/17/2021. The memorandum of law may be no larger than 35 pages in length,. IT IS SO ORDERED by Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr on 9/7/2021. (bjw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 06, 2021
30 30 motion Continue Mon 09/06 1:27 PM
Consent MOTION to Continue and Enlarge Page Limit filed by Travis Woods. Response to Motion due by 9/27/2021 Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (Bizer, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
29 29 order Order on Letter Request Wed 06/30 9:04 AM
TEXT ORDER: Granting #28 Letter Request. The discovery cutoff is extended to 7/30/2021. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 6/30/2021. (kmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
28 28 motion Letter Request/Motion Tue 06/29 11:40 AM
Letter Motion from W. Bradley Hunt, Esq. for Central New York Regional Transportation Authority, Centro of Oneida, Inc. requesting four-day extension of the end of discovery date submitted to Judge Hon. Andrew T. Baxter . (Hunt, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 02, 2021
27 27 order Order on Letter Request Fri 04/02 3:12 PM
TEXT ORDER: re26 Letter Request. Deadlines are extended as follows: The discovery cutoff is extended to 7/26/2021 (defendants' expert disclosures due by 6/4/2021; and any rebuttal disclosures are due by 6/28/2021). Dispositive Motions are to be filed by 9/10/2021. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 4/2/2021. (nmk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 31, 2021
26 26 motion Letter Request/Motion Wed 03/31 2:59 PM
Letter Motion from W. Bradley Hunt for Central New York Regional Transportation Authority, Centro of Oneida, Inc. requesting a Conference pursuant to Rule 7.1 submitted to Judge Hon. Andrew T. Baxter .(Hunt, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A
Thursday, February 11, 2021
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/11 4:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Hunt on behalf of Central New York Regional Transportation Authority, Centro of Oneida, Inc. (Hunt, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
24 24 adr Report of Mandatory Mediation Wed 01/06 12:02 PM
REPORT OF MANDATORY MEDIATION - A Mandatory Mediation session was held on 01/06/2021. Total Hours Spent by Mediator: 2.0; The outcome of Mandatory Mediation is: MEDIATION IS COMPLETE. CASE DID NOT SETTLE. The case will proceed toward trial pursuant to the Courts Uniform Pretrial Scheduling Order. (Sciotti, Michael)
Related: [-]
23 23 adr Confidentiality Agreement Wed 01/06 12:01 PM
CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT (Sciotti, Michael)
Related: [-]
adr ADR Completed Wed 01/06 2:00 PM
ADR COMPLETED - CASE DID NOT SETTLE. Mediator Michael J. Sciotti terminated.(rjb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2020
minutes Status Conference Thu 12/17 3:29 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for telephonic Status Conference held on 12/17/2020 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter: The joinder of parties and amendment of pleadings deadlines have expired. Counsel advise there are no issues with the current pleadings. Further, Counsel provide an update on the progress of discovery, including expert discovery and advise they will participate in mediation before the set deadline. Counsel are directed to advise the court if any issues arise that require intervention. Appearances: Andrew Bizer, Esq. for plaintiff; Christian Jones, Esq. for defendants. Time: 1:33 PM - 1:40 PM. (nmk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
22 22 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 12/08 3:16 PM
TEXT ORDER: The court sua sponte extends the deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation to 1/11/2021. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 12/8/2020. (nmk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
21 21 adr Stipulation Selecting Mediator Thu 12/03 4:33 PM
STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that Michael Sciotti, Esq. has been selected, contacted and has agreed to serve as Mediator for this action. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that counsel will participate in the mediation session in good faith and confer with the Mediator regarding the scheduling of additional conferences, bearing in mind the deadline for completion of Mediation set forth in the Court's Order Referring the Case to Mediation. Stipulation signed by: Christian P. Jones and Andrew Bizer. Dated: 12/3/2020(Jones, Christian)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2020
20 20 order Protective Order Mon 08/17 5:04 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER: Setting forth the terms and conditions on the exchange and disclosure of confidential materials in this matter. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 8/17/2020. (nmk)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 14, 2020
19 19 misc Stipulation Fri 08/14 4:16 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulated Protective Order by Travis Woods submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (Bizer, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 13, 2020
18 18 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mandatory Mediation Thu 08/13 12:39 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 10/30/2020. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 12/11/2020. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 8/13/2020. (nmk)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Uniform Pretrial Scheduling Order Thu 08/13 12:31 PM
UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for the joinder of parties and the amendment of pleadings is 10/16/2020. Discovery cutoff is 6/21/2021 (plaintiff's expert disclosures due by 3/23/2021; defendants' expert disclosures due by 5/7/2021; and any rebuttal disclosures are due by 5/24/2021). Substantive motions to be filed by 8/30/2021. Anticipated length of trial: 3 days. Preferred Trial Location: Albany. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 8/13/2020. (nmk)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 08/13 12:10 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for telephonic Rule 16 conference held on 8/13/2020 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter: The court explained the Mandatory Mediation Program to counsel. Mandatory disclosures have been exchanged. Pretrial deadlines were established. A scheduling order will be issued on behalf of Senior Judge Scullin. Counsel may submit a proposed protective order for the court's consideration. A follow-up telephone conference is set for 12/17/2020 at 1:30 PM. Appearances: Andrew Bizer, Esq. for plaintiff; Christian Jones, Esq. for defendants. Time: 11:33 AM - 11:39 AM. (nmk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 06, 2020
16 16 misc Civil Case Management Plan Thu 08/06 12:18 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Travis Woods. (Bizer, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 28, 2020
15 15 order Stipulation and Order Tue 07/28 12:39 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL The City of Utica is dismissed without prejudice and without costs or fees.. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr on 7/28/2020. (bjw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 27, 2020
14 14 service Certificate of Service Mon 07/27 4:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Central New York Regional Transportation Authority, Centro of Oneida, Inc. re13 Answer to Complaint (Jones, Christian)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/27 4:32 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Central New York Regional Transportation Authority, Centro of Oneida, Inc..(Jones, Christian)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 07/27 12:41 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal partial by City of Utica submitted to Judge Scullin. (Oren, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2020
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed (for non-Pro Se cases only) Fri 07/10 11:48 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travis Woods. City of Utica served on 6/3/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Bizer, Andrew)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed (for non-Pro Se cases only) Fri 07/10 11:48 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travis Woods. Central New York Regional Transportation Authority served on 6/5/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Bizer, Andrew)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed (for non-Pro Se cases only) Fri 07/10 11:47 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travis Woods. Centro of Oneida, Inc. served on 6/3/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Bizer, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
8 8 order Order on Letter Request Wed 06/24 6:05 PM
TEXT ORDER: granting7 Letter Request for an extension of time. The time for defendants Central New York Regional Transportation Authority and Centro of Oneida, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 7/27/2020. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 6/24/2020. (nmk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
7 7 motion Letter Request/Motion Tue 06/23 12:52 PM
Letter Motion from Christian P. Jones, Esq. for Central New York Regional Transportation Authority, Centro of Oneida, Inc. requesting Extension of Time to Answer Complaint submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter . (Jones, Christian)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2020
6 6 order Order on Letter Request Mon 06/15 12:17 PM
TEXT ORDER: granting5 Letter Request. The time for defendant City of Utica to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 7/27/2020. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 6/15/2020. (nmk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 11, 2020
5 5 motion Letter Request/Motion Thu 06/11 4:15 PM
Letter Motion from Zachary C. Oren for City of Utica requesting an approximate 30 day extension to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint submitted to Judge Baxter . (Oren, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 04, 2020
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/04 4:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Oren on behalf of City of Utica (Oren, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 13, 2020
3 3 misc G.O. 25 Filing Order Thu 05/14 4:31 PM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 8/13/2020 11:30 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/6/2020. All conferences will be conducted by telephone unless the parties are specifically directed to appear. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to coordinate the initial conference call. Once all parties are on the conference line, Judge Baxter's chambers can be reached at 315-234-8600. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 05/14 4:27 PM
Summons Issued as to Central New York Regional Transportation Authority, Centro of Oneida, Inc., City of Utica.(mgh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Issued as to Central New York Regional Transportation Authority,
Att: 2 Summons Issued as to the City of Utica
Tuesday, May 12, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/14 4:23 PM
COMPLAINT against Central New York Regional Transportation Authority, Centro of Oneida, Inc., City of Utica (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5116311) filed by Travis Woods.(mgh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet