Original Case: 6:20-cv-00539

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-02629
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Case Filed:Oct 05, 2022
Terminated:Jun 10, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 11, 2024 6:56 AM EDT
Amicus Curiae
New York Public Transit Association
Represented By
Margaret Stephenson
Dowling Law, PLLC
contact info
Amicus Curiae
American Public Transporation Association
Represented By
Margaret Stephenson
Dowling Law, PLLC
contact info
Amicus Curiae
Disability Rights Education & Defense Fund
Represented By
Maria Michelle Uzeta
Disability Rights Education And Defense Fund
contact info
Defendant
City of Utica
Defendant - Appellee
Centro of Oneida, Inc.
Represented By
Christian P. Jones
Mackenzie Hughes LLP
contact info
William Bradley Hunt
Mackenzie Hughes LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Central New York Regional Transportation Authority
Represented By
Christian P. Jones
Mackenzie Hughes LLP
contact info
William Bradley Hunt
Mackenzie Hughes LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Travis Woods, an individual
Represented By
Andrew D. Bizer
Bizer & DeReus, LLC
contact info
Garret S. DeReus
Bizer & DeReus, LLC
contact info

GPO Jun 10 2024
OPINION, affirming the judgment of the district court, by GC, RJS, MP, FILED.[3625786] [22-2629]

Docket last updated: 06/11/2024 6:55 AM EDT
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Travis Woods, FILED. [3403312] 22-2629 [Entered: 10/19/2022 10:00 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 7 pgs Case FILED
2 2 14 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER, dated 09/19/2022, RECEIVED.[3403323] 22-2629 [Entered: 10/19/2022 10:04 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/19/2022, RECEIVED.[3403324] 22-2629 [Entered: 10/19/2022 10:04 AM]
Related: [-]
4 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Travis Woods, district court receipt # ANYNDC-6052464, FILED.[3403325] 22-2629 [Entered: 10/19/2022 10:05 AM]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3403327] 22-2629 [Entered: 10/19/2022 10:05 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 7 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED