Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11231

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael E Wiles
Case #: 1:20-ap-01088
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:May 14, 2020
Terminated:Aug 17, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
220 5 TH Realty, LLC
Represented By
220 5 TH Realty, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John Shams
CEO Scorpion Fitness, Inc. Scorpion Club Ventures, LLC 325 Fifth Avenue 41E
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
John Shams
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Monday, August 17, 2020
12 12 order Motion, Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 08/17 11:11 AM
Order signed on 8/17/2020 dismissing adversary proceeding for lack of standing Related [+]. (DePierola, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 3
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 08/17 11:14 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1088 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (DePierola, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2020
11 11 misc Affidavit of Service Mon 08/03 10:35 AM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of 220 5 TH Realty, LLC. (Scott, Brendan)
Related: [-] 10
Friday, July 31, 2020
10 10 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Fri 07/31 4:54 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Notice of Adjournment of Pre-Trial Conference and Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Related [+] filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of 220 5 TH Realty, LLC. with hearing to be held on 8/11/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) (Scott, Brendan)
Related: [-] 3
Thursday, July 30, 2020
9 9 misc Transcript Fri 07/31 1:58 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 07/22/2020 RE: MOTION TO DISMISS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING; PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/28/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Access Transcripts, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 8/6/2020. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/20/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/31/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/28/2020. (Lewis, Tenille)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 18, 2020
8 8 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 06/18 12:08 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of 220 5 TH Realty, LLC. (Scott, Brendan)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Thu 06/18 11:32 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Notice of Adjournment of Pre-Trial Conference filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of 220 5 TH Realty, LLC. with hearing to be held on 7/22/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) (Scott, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 17, 2020
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/17 5:32 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of 220 5 TH Realty, LLC. (Scott, Brendan)
Related: [-] 4 ,5 ,3
5 5 notice Notice, Hearing Wed 06/17 4:44 PM
Notice of Hearing of Defendant's Motion for an Order (i) Dismissing Adversary Proceeding in its Entirety Based Upon Plaintiffs Lack of Standing and Insufficient Service of Process, or Alternatively (ii) Extending Time to Respond to Complaint Until Thirty Days After Court Grants Standing to Plaintiff Related [+] filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of 220 5 TH Realty, LLC. (Scott, Brendan)
Related: [-] 3
4 4 answer Declaration Wed 06/17 4:42 PM
Declaration Declaration of Pawan Melgiri, Senior Vice President of Stellar Management in Support of Defendant's Motion for an Order (i) Dismissing Adversary Proceeding in its Entirety Based Upon Plaintiffs Lack of Standing and Insufficient Service of Process, or Alternatively (ii) Extending Time to Respond to Complaint Until Thirty Days After Court Grants Standing to Plaintiff Related [+] filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of 220 5 TH Realty, LLC. (Scott, Brendan)
Related: [-] 3
3 3 motion Motion, Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 06/17 4:38 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Defendant's Motion for an Order (i) Dismissing Adversary Proceeding in its Entirety Based Upon Plaintiffs Lack of Standing and Insufficient Service of Process, or Alternatively (ii) Extending Time to Respond to Complaint Until Thirty Days After Court Grants Standing to Plaintiff filed by Brendan M. Scott on behalf of 220 5 TH Realty, LLC. with hearing to be held on 7/22/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) Responses due by 7/15/2020, (Scott, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 18, 2020
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Mon 05/18 3:33 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/30/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW), Answer due by 6/17/2020, (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 14, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 05/18 2:06 PM
Adversary case 20-01088 Complaint against 220 5 TH Realty, LLC (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) Filed by John Shams. (Lopez, Mary)
Related: [-]