|
GPO
Dec 08 2014
ORDER re Motions for Reconsideration: With the exceptions noted in the attached Order, the motions for reconsideration and clarification of the November 7 Order and CMO 12 are DENIED. See Order for details. So Ordered by Magistrate Judges Cheryl L. Pollak, Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., and Gary R. Brown. [This is a duplicate of D.E. 852 in 14-MC-41].
|
|
GPO
Sep 30 2016
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The motion 92 to dismiss is denied. The summary judgment motions 123 & 124 are also denied as premature; they may be revived after issue is joined and appropriate discovery on any new matters is completed. See attached Memorandum and Order for details. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 9/30/2016. (Innelli, Michael)
|
|
GPO
Oct 20 2017
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 171. Plaintiffs motion to quash the subpoena or for a protective order is denied. Allstate is directed to submit its subpoena directed to Christies (and Locksons, should Allstate choose to issue a subpoena) for the Court to so order. Plaintiffs, Robert Toussie and Laura Toussie, as well as their agents, employees, or any other person acting on their behalf, are enjoined from removing any boxes or property from the storage units rented located at Christies Fine Art Storage Services, 100 Imlay Street, Brooklyn, NY 11231 absent permission from this Court. This prohibition shall remain in place until the earlier of November 6, 2017 or the inspection of the premises by the defendant. See Order for details. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/20/2017.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/20/2017. (Blase, Brendan)
|
|
GPO
Oct 27 2017
ORDER denying (176) in case 1:14-cv-02705-FB-CLP; denying (115) in case 1:15-cv-05235-ARR-PK. The Court denies plaintiffs' motions. The October 30, 2017 inspection shall proceed as previously ordered. Although sanctions have not been requested at this time, the Court expects that going forward, plaintiffs and their counsel will adhere to the Federal Rules and this Court's prior Orders and will not continue to re-litigate the same issues previously decided by the Court. See Order for details. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/27/2017. (Blase, Brendan) Modified on 10/27/2017 (Blase, Brendan).
|
|
GPO
Nov 06 2017
ORDER. The Court-ordered subpoena dated 10/23/2017 continues in effect. Christies Fine Art and Storage Services is ORDERED to make the storage space at 100 Imlay Street, Brooklyn, NY 11231, available and to permit the inspection, from day to day as scheduled by the parties, until the inspection has been completed or until further order of this Court. Furthermore, the plaintiffs, Robert Toussie and Laura Toussie, as well as their agents, employees, or any other person acting on their behalf, are ENJOINED from removing any boxes or property from the aforementioned storage units absent permission from this Court. This prohibition shall remain in place until the earlier of January 15, 2018 or the completion of the inspection of the premises by the defendant. The parties shall file a joint status report by 12/04/2017.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/6/2017. (Blase, Brendan)
|
|
GPO
Dec 28 2017
ORDER. Upon further review, the Court concludes that plaintiffs' withdrawing counsel has demonstrated good cause to seal portions of the motions to withdraw. It is therefore ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file their motions to withdraw under seal and shall file on the public docket versions of their motions that redact the preantepenultimate and antepenultimate paragraphs. Due to technical difficulties with the EDNY's internal CM/ECF system, the Court was delayed in uploading this Order and notifying the parties of its contents, and the Court therefore DIRECTS the Clerk of the Court to restrict access to the following entries: ECF No. (185) in case number 14-cv-2705 and ECF No. (133) in case number 15-cv-5235.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 12/28/2017. (Blase, Brendan)
|
|
GPO
Jan 12 2018
PROTECTIVE/PRESERVATION ORDER re: 172, 179. For the reasons set forth in the attached Order, the Court concludes it is appropriate that its 172-179 earlier Preservation Orders continue in effect. The Court therefore ORDERS that plaintiff, Robert Toussie, and Laura Toussie, as well as their agents, employees, or any other person, are ENJOINED from removing any boxes or property from the storage units located at Christie's Fine Art Storage Services, 100 Imlay Street, Brooklyn, NY 11231, absent permission from this Court. This prohibition shall remain in place until the earlier of March 15, 2018 or the conclusion of the inspection of the premises. Counsel for Allstate Insurance Company is directed to serve a copy of this Order on Christie's Fine Art Storage Services. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/12/2018. (Blase, Brendan)
|
|
GPO
Mar 05 2020
MEMORANDUM and ORDER: Allstates motion 229 for summary judgment is granted in its entirely and Toussies cross-motion 230 is denied. The case is dismissed with prejudice. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 3/5/2020. (Innelli, Michael)
|