Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:20-ap-03047
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:May 21, 2020
Terminated:May 13, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
CareCo Continuum of Care, Inc.
Represented By
CareCo Continuum of Care, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
CareCo Shoreline, Inc.
Represented By
CareCo Shoreline, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
CareCo Medical, Inc.
Represented By
CareCo Medical, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Paula S. Beran
Tavenner & Beran, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, May 13, 2021
28 28 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Thu 05/13 2:05 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 19, 2021
27 27 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Sat 03/20 12:15 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)26 Default Judgment
Wednesday, March 17, 2021
26 26 order Default Judgment Wed 03/17 4:34 PM
Default Judgment Related [+] Judgment is hereby entered in favor of the Trustee in the amount of $24,014.00 (the Judgment Amount) plus interest at the statutory rate from entry of this order until paid. (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)16 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
Thursday, March 11, 2021
25 25 notice CerDocTyp - Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Fri 03/12 12:16 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript has been filed. Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the clerk's office or may be purchased from the court transcriber for a 90 day period. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)24 Transcript filed
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
24 24 court Transcript filed Tue 03/09 9:24 AM
Transcript filed Re: Hearing Held 2/25/2021, Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 06/7/2021. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber eScribers, Telephone number 973-406-2250.] [Transcript Purchased by Thomas McKee.] Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 03/16/2021. Redaction Request Due By 03/30/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 04/9/2021. Transcript access will be restricted through 06/7/2021. (Gottlieb, Jason)
Related: [-] 21 Hearing held; Motion GRANTED Appearance(s): Paula Beran for Trustee (Re: related document(s)16 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee)
Friday, February 26, 2021
23 23 notice CerDocTyp - Inquiry/General Checksheet BNC Certification of Service Sat 02/27 12:21 AM
Inquiry/General Checksheet BNC Certification of Service Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 20 Inquiry/General Checksheet
22 22 notice CerDocTyp - Notice of Deficient Filing Sat 02/27 12:21 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 19 Notice of Deficient Filing Issued
Thursday, February 25, 2021
21 21 court Hearing held Thu 02/25 11:34 AM
Hearing held; Motion GRANTED Appearance(s): Paula Beran for Trustee Related [+] (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)16 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
20 20 court 4 - Inquiry/General Checksheet Request Wed 02/24 11:06 AM
Inquiry/General Checksheet Issued to CareCo Shoreline, Inc. regarding Requirement of Form or Process; not accompanied by proof of service. Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)18 Response to Motion/Application filed by CareCo Shoreline, Inc.
19 19 court Deficient Filing Notice Request Wed 02/24 11:02 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing Issued to CareCo Shoreline, Inc. regarding Document does not include a certification whether an Attorney assisted with the preparation of the document. [See LBR 2090-1] and Requirement of Counsel: filed on behalf of an entity not a natural person acting on own behalf and not signed by counsel permitted to appear under LBR 2090-1. [See LBR 9010-1] Related [+] Document(s) due by 3/10/2021. (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)18 Response to Motion/Application filed by CareCo Shoreline, Inc.
Thursday, February 18, 2021
18 18 answer Response Tue 02/23 11:33 AM
Response to Motion for Default Judgment Related [+] filed by CareCo Shoreline, Inc.. (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)16 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
17 17 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 01/26 2:24 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Paula S. Beran of Tavenner & Beran, PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 2/25/2021 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Beran, Paula)
Related: [-] related document(s)16 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
16 16 motion Default Judgment Tue 01/26 2:22 PM
Corrected Motion for Default Judgment (Attaching Correct Document) filed by Paula S. Beran of Tavenner & Beran, PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Beran, Paula)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Default Judgment Tue 01/26 2:11 PM
Motion for Default Judgment filed by Paula S. Beran of Tavenner & Beran, PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Beran, Paula)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
14 14 court BNC certificate of mailing Fri 12/04 12:18 AM
BNC certificate of mailing Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)11 Entry of Default
13 13 court BNC certificate of mailing Fri 12/04 12:18 AM
BNC certificate of mailing Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Entry of Default
12 12 court BNC certificate of mailing Fri 12/04 12:18 AM
BNC certificate of mailing Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)9 Entry of Default
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
11 11 court Entry of Default Tue 12/01 10:53 AM
Entry of Default against CareCo Medical, Inc. Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)8 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
10 10 court Entry of Default Tue 12/01 10:51 AM
Entry of Default against CareCo Shoreline, Inc. Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)8 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
9 9 court Entry of Default Tue 12/01 10:49 AM
Entry of Default against CareCo Continuum of Care, Inc. Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)8 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
Thursday, November 12, 2020
8 8 motion Entry of Default Thu 11/12 12:06 PM
Motion for Entry of Default filed by Paula S. Beran of Tavenner & Beran, PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Beran, Paula)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
7 7 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Thu 09/17 5:31 PM
Withdrawal of Appearance by David N. Tabakin. (Tabakin, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2020
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Thu 07/16 10:47 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by David N. Tabakin of Tavenner & Beran PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Tabakin, David)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint,5 Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY
Thursday, June 18, 2020
5 5 summon Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY Thu 06/18 1:42 PM
Alias Summons and notice issued to CareCo Continuum of Care, Inc. ; CareCo Medical, Inc. ; CareCo Shoreline, Inc. Related [+] (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint
Wednesday, June 17, 2020
4 4 misc Request for Alias Summons Wed 06/17 3:48 PM
Request for Alias Summons Related [+] filed by David N. Tabakin of Tavenner & Beran PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Tabakin, David)
Related: [-] related document(s)2 Summons and Notice
Friday, May 22, 2020
3 3 crditcrd none Fri 05/22 12:31 PM
Payment Cleared on Complaint 20-03047 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 118633, amount $ 350.00 (Paid over the counter). Related [+] (Gary) Modified on 5/22/2020 (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 summon Summons and Notice; Answer Fri 05/22 11:10 AM
Summons and notice issued to CareCo Continuum of Care, Inc. Answer Due 6/22/2020; CareCo Medical, Inc. Answer Due 6/22/2020; CareCo Shoreline, Inc. Answer Due 6/22/2020 Related [+] (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint
Thursday, May 21, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 05/21 1:26 PM
Adversary case 20-03047 Complaint against CareCo Continuum of Care, Inc., CareCo Shoreline, Inc., CareCo Medical, Inc. filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Beran, Paula) Modified on 5/22/2020 to correct party filer (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-]