Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:19-bk-34574
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2019
Creditor Meeting:Nov 12, 2019
Converted:Oct 04, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
LeClairRyan PLLC
4405 Cox Road
Glen Allen, VA 23060
Represented By
Henry Pollard Long, III
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Tyler P. Brown
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Jason William Harbour
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Jennifer Ellen Wuebker
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Debtor
Lori D. Thompson
LeClairRyan PLLC 4405 Cox Rd
Glen Allen, VA 23060
Represented By
Lori D. Thompson
Spilman, Thomas Battle PLLC
contact info
Lori D. Thompson
contact info
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 28, 2022 7:06 AM EST
Accountant
Barry Strickland & Company
P.O. Box 9228
Richmond, VA 23227
Attorney
Columbia Casualty Company
CNA Coverage Litigation Group 2020 K Street, NW Suite 750
Washington, DC 20006
Represented By
Rebecca L. Saitta
Wiley Rein LLP
contact info
Attorney
Foley & Lardner LLP
Washington Office 3000 K Street, N.W. Suite 600
Washington, DC 20007
Represented By
Susan Poll Klaessy
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Attorney
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
Represented By
Henry Pollard Long, III
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Tyler P. Brown
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Attorney
Brandon R. Jordan
RAS Crane LLC 11900 Parklawn Drive Suite 310
Rockville, MD 20852
Represented By
Brandon R. Jordan
Ras Crane & Partners, PLLC
contact info
Attorney
Ronald Page, PLC
P.O. Box 73087
N. Chesterfield, VA 23235
Represented By
Ronald A. Page, Jr.
Ronald Page, PLC
contact info
Attorney
Tavenner & Beran, PLC
20 North 8th Street, Second Floor
Richmond, VA 23219
Represented By
Paula S. Beran
contact info
blank
Charles Erik Gustafson
Represented By
Diana Lyn Curtis McGraw
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
blank
Jason Medley
Represented By
Diana Lyn Curtis McGraw
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Broker
XCLAIM Inc.
XCLAIM Inc. 2261 Market Street #4385
San Francisco, CA 94114
Creditor
ABL Alliance, LLLP
Represented By
Douglas M. Foley
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Creditor
Admiral Cochrane, LLC, successor in interest to MLQ-ELD, LLC and LSOP 3C III, LLC
Represented By
Robert C. Gill
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Advanced Discovery Inc.
Creditor
Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph S. Sheerin
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Creditor
Archer, NSG
Creditor
Former Attorney
Represented By
Andrew M. Bowman
Gentry Locke
contact info
Creditor
BCal 44 Montgomery Property LLC
Represented By
Peter D. Bilowz
Goulston & Storrs, PC
contact info
Creditor
Bank Direct
Represented By
Kevin J. Funk
Durrette, Arkema, Gerson & Gill PC
contact info
Creditor
Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By
Michael Gabriel Gallerizzo
Gebhardt & Smith LLP
contact info
Michael D. Nord
Gebhardt & Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
Berkley Select
411 E. Franklin St. Suite 600
Richmond, VA 23219
Represented By
Jennifer J. West
Spotts Fain PC
contact info
Creditor
Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company
411 E. Franklin St. Suite 600
Richmond, VA 23219
Represented By
Jennifer J. West
Spotts Fain PC
contact info
Creditor
Best of the West, Two Trees Products
Creditor
CARLYLE OVERLOOK OWNER LLC
Represented By
Richard E. Lear
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Amy Michelle Simon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Creditor
Andrew Chien
665 Ellsworth Avenue
New Haven, CT 06511
Creditor
Christian & Barton, LLP
411 E. Franklin Street Suite 600
Richmond, VA 23219
Represented By
Karl A. Moses, Jr.
Spotts Fain PC
contact info
Robert H. Chappell, III
Spotts Fain PC
contact info
Creditor
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Department of Labor and Industry Collections Support Unit 651 Boas Street, Room 702
Harrisburg, PA 17121
Creditor
ConvergeOne, Inc.
10900 Nesbitt Ave S
Bloomington, MN 55437
Represented By
Kyle Russell Hosmer
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Creditor
Michele Craddock
Represented By
Michael Gregory Wilson
Reaves Coley PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Creative Office Environments of Richmond, LLC
2605 Kensington Ave
Richmond, VA 23220
Represented By
William Gray
Sands Anderson
contact info
Creditor
Robert Davis
Represented By
Michael Gregory Wilson
Reaves Coley PLLC
contact info
Creditor
De Lage Landen Financial Services, Inc.c/o Nicola Suglia, Esquire
Fleischer, Fleischer & Suglia, P.C. 601 Route 73 North, Suite 305
Marlton, NJ 08053
Represented By
Nicola G. Suglia
Fleischer, Fleischer & Suglia
contact info
Creditor
Dominion Investigative Group LLC
Creditor
EYP Realty, LLC
Represented By
Stephen A. Metz
Offit Kurman, PA
contact info
Creditor
First Legal Network, LLC
Represented By
Ronald A. Page, Jr.
Ronald Page, PLC
contact info
Creditor
Linda Georgiadis
Represented By
Ronald A. Page, Jr.
Ronald Page, PLC
contact info
Creditor
Grant S. Grayson
Represented By
Bradford F. Englander
Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P.
contact info
Creditor
Hain Capital Group, LLC
Hain Capital Group, LLC 301 Route 17 North, 7th Floor
Rutherford, NJ 07070
Creditor
Harris County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarge Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Hassell Law Group
4079 19th Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94132
Creditor
Hertz Norfolk 999 Waterside, LLC
Represented By
Joshua David Stiff
Whiteford Taylor Preston LLP
contact info
Creditor
Iron Mountain Information Management, LLC
One Federal Street 7th Floor
Boston, MA 02110
Represented By
Joseph Corrigan
Iron Mountain Information Management LLC
contact info
Creditor
JM Partners LLC
6800 Paragon Place Suite 202
Richmond, VA 23230
Creditor
Allison Koschak
LawPartner, LLC PO Box 8712
Richmond, VA 23226
Creditor
LS Gold LLC
Represented By
David R. Ruby
Thompson Mcmullan, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Latham & Watkins LLP
Represented By
James K. Donaldson
Limnexus LLP
contact info
Creditor
Gary D. LeClair
Represented By
Andrew M. Bowman
Gentry Locke
contact info
William A. Broscious
William A. Broscious, Esq., PLC
contact info
Creditor
Leader Bank, N.A.
Arent Fox LLP 1717 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006
Represented By
Mary Joanne Dowd
Arent Fox LLP
contact info
Creditor
MDPC
Creditor
Latonya Mallory
710 Meadow View Ridge
Manakin-Sabat, VA 23103
Represented By
Robert Taggart Hall
Hall & Sethi, PLC
contact info
Creditor
Manchester VAMC
Creditor
Masergy Communications, Inc.
411 E. Franklin Street Suite 600
Richmond, VA 23219
Represented By
Robert H. Chappell, III
Spotts Fain PC
contact info
Creditor
Robert S. McWhorter
Represented By
Ronald A. Page, Jr.
Ronald Page, PLC
contact info
Creditor
Morrison Sund, PLLC
5125 County Road 101 Suite 200
Minnetonka, MN 55345
Represented By
Cynthia L. Hegarty
Morrison Sund, PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Lisa M. Murphy
Zemanian Law Group 223 East City Hall Ave, Ste 201
Norfolk, VA 23510
Represented By
Paul A. Driscoll
Zemanian Law Group
contact info
Creditor
NAFCED
Creditor
Park Towers Investment, LLC
411 E. Franklin St. Suite 600
Richmond, VA 23219
Represented By
Neil E. McCullagh
Spotts Fain PC
contact info
Creditor
Park Towers Office Investment, LLC
411 E. Franklin St. Suite 600
Richmond, VA 23219
Represented By
Neil E. McCullagh
Spotts Fain PC
contact info
Creditor
Parma Richmond LLC
Represented By
Kevin J. Funk
Durrette, Arkema, Gerson & Gill PC
contact info
Creditor
Petersburg Regency LLC
Represented By
Michael Gregory Wilson
Reaves Coley PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Planet Depos, LLC
405 East Gude Drive, Suite 209
Rockville, MD 20850
Represented By
Shawn Charles Whittaker
Law Office Of Shawn C. Whittaker, Pc T/a Whittaker Myers, PC
contact info
Creditor
Ponte Gadea Washington, LLC
Attn: Thomas J. McKee Jr 1750 Tysons Blvd., #1000
McLean, VA 22102
Represented By
Thomas John McKee, Jr.
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Creditor
R.F. Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Gregory Wilson
Reaves Coley PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Rodney K. Adams, John T. Jessee, Paul C. Kuhnel, and Andrew K. Clark
Woods Rogers PLC 10. S. Jefferson Street, Suite 1800
Roanoke, VA 24011
Represented By
Michael E. Hastings
Woods Rogers PLC
contact info
Creditor
N Pendleton Rogers
2100 E. Cary Street 2100 E. Cary Street
Richmond, VA 23223
Represented By
Franklin R. Cragle, III
Hirschler Fleischer, PC
contact info
Creditor
Scottsdale Insurance Company
411 E. Franklin St. Suite 600
Richmond, VA 23219
Represented By
Jennifer J. West
Spotts Fain PC
contact info
Creditor
Specified Former LR Attorneys
Represented By
Bradford F. Englander
Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P.
contact info
Creditor
Super-Server, LLC
Represented By
Karen M. Crowley
Crowley Law P.C.
contact info
Creditor
The State of New Hampshire
Creditor
ULX Partners, LLC
Greenberg Traurig, LLP 1750 Tysons Blvd., Suite 1000
McLean, VA 22102
Represented By
David G. Barger
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Thomas John McKee, Jr.
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Creditor
UnitedLex Corporation
Greenberg Traurig, LLP 1750 Tysons Blvd., Suite 1000
McLean, VA 22102
Represented By
David G. Barger
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Thomas John McKee, Jr.
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Creditor
Robert A Wayne
Represented By
Christopher L. Perkins
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Wilmington Trust, National Association, not in its individual capacity but solely as trustee for MFRA Trust 2014-2
Represented By
Kelly R Gring
Tromberg, Morris Poulin, PLLC
contact info
Creditor
iManage, LLC
Represented By
Alexander Richard Green
Mcglinchey Stafford PLLC
contact info
Financial Advisor
CR3 Partners, LLC
Interested Party
Benjamin C. Ackerly, Successor Trustee
Represented By
Tyler P. Brown
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Interested Party
CVC Advisers (India) Private Limited
Represented By
Michael E. Hastings
Woods Rogers PLC
contact info
Interested Party
Certain Former Attorneys
Represented By
Christopher L. Perkins
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Frank Cerza
Represented By
James K. Donaldson
Limnexus LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Gretchen Jackson
Represented By
John G. McJunkin
Baker Donelson
contact info
J. David Folds
Baker Donelson
contact info
Interested Party
Joseph Lagrotteria
Represented By
Christopher L. Perkins
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Bruce H. Matson
Represented By
Dion W. Hayes
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Jennifer Mistal-Kashinejed
Represented By
Darek S. Bushnaq
Venable LLP
contact info
Interested Party
. TR Capital Management LLC
PO Box 633
Woodmere, NY 11598
Interested Party
Robin Teskin
Represented By
John G. McJunkin
Baker Donelson
contact info
J. David Folds
Baker Donelson
contact info
Mediator
Peter Barrett
901 East Byrd Street Suite 1000
Richmond, VA 23219
Represented By
Peter J. Barrett
Kutak Rock L.L.P.
contact info
Mediator
H. David Cox
900 Lakeside Dr.
Lynchburg, VA 24501
Represented By
Herbert David Cox
Cox Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Mediator
Rachel C. Strickland
Other Professional
American Legal Claims Services, LLC
Professional
Protiviti, Inc
Special Counsel
Cozen O'Connor
Special Counsel
Gilbert LLP
700 Pennsylvania Ave., SE Suite 400
Washington, DC 20003
Special Counsel
Merritt Law, PLLC
919 East Main Street, Suite 1000
Richmond, VA 23219
Special Counsel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
Represented By
Erika L. Morabito
Quinn Emanuel
contact info
Brittany Jane Nelson
Quinn Emanuel
contact info
Trustee
Lynn L. Tavenner
341 Dial 866-630-1691 Code: 9791870 20 North Eighth Street, Second Floor
Richmond, VA 23219
Represented By
David N. Tabakin
contact info
Erika L. Morabito
Quinn Emanuel
contact info
Lynn L. Tavenner
contact info
Brittany Jane Nelson
Quinn Emanuel
contact info
Paula S. Beran
contact info
Trustee
Benjamin C. Ackerly, Successor Trustee
Represented By
Tyler P. Brown
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
John P. Fitzgerald, III
Office of the US Trustee - Region 4 -R 701 E. Broad Street, Ste. 4304
Richmond, VA 23219
Represented By
Kenneth N. Whitehurst, III
Office Of The U. S. Trustee
contact info
Robert B. Van Arsdale
Office Of The U. S. Trustee
contact info
Unknown
Elizabeth Acee
Represented By
Diana Lyn Curtis McGraw
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Unknown
Richard W. Bowerman
Represented By
Diana Lyn Curtis McGraw
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Unknown
Paul Burleigh
Represented By
Diana Lyn Curtis McGraw
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Unknown
John P. Cahill
Represented By
Diana Lyn Curtis McGraw
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Unknown
Karol Corbin Walker
Represented By
Diana Lyn Curtis McGraw
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Unknown
District of Columbia Court of Appeals
Unknown
Mark Dombroff
Represented By
Diana Lyn Curtis McGraw
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Unknown
Niclas Ferland
Represented By
Diana Lyn Curtis McGraw
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Unknown
Janice Grubin
Represented By
Diana Lyn Curtis McGraw
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Unknown
Christopher J. Lange
Represented By
Diana Lyn Curtis McGraw
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Unknown
Lori Thompson
Represented By
Diana Lyn Curtis McGraw
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Unknown
Andrew Zappia
Represented By
Diana Lyn Curtis McGraw
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 10:10 AM EDT
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
1 1 11 pgs misc Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Tue 09/03 8:48 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Filed by Tyler P. Brown of Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP on behalf of LeClairRyan PLLC. (Brown, Tyler)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 09/03 8:49 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition 19-34574 [misc,824] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 31091622, amount $1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
3 3 17 pgs misc Declaration Tue 09/03 8:52 AM
Declaration (Declaration of Lori D. Thompson, Esq. in Support of Chapter 11 Petition and First Day Motions) Related [+] filed by Tyler P. Brown of Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP on behalf of LeClairRyan PLLC. (Brown, Tyler)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition filed by LeClairRyan PLLC
4 4 motion Approve Tue 09/03 8:56 AM
Motion to Approve (Motion of LeClairRyan PLLC for Entry of an Order (I) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice of Commencement of the Chapter 11 Case and (II) Waiving the Requirement That the Debtor Submit a Formatted Mailing Matrix) filed by Tyler P. Brown of Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP on behalf of LeClairRyan PLLC. (Brown, Tyler)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extend Time to File Lists Schedules and/or Statements Tue 09/03 8:59 AM
Motion to Extend Time to File Lists, Schedules and/or Statements (Motion of LeClairRyan PLLC for Entry of an Order (I) Extending the Time to File Schedules and Statements of Financial Affairs and (II) Extending the Time to Schedule the Meeting of Creditors) filed by Tyler P. Brown of Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP on behalf of LeClairRyan PLLC. (Brown, Tyler)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Approve Tue 09/03 9:02 AM
Motion to Approve (Motion of LeClairRyan PLLC for Entry of an Order Establishing Certain Notice, Case Management and Administrative Procedures) filed by Tyler P. Brown of Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP on behalf of LeClairRyan PLLC. (Brown, Tyler)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Approve Tue 09/03 9:12 AM
Motion to Approve (Motion of LeClairRyan PLLC for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing Debtor to Maintain Existing Bank Accounts and Business Forms and Continue to Use Exisiting Cash Management System and (II) Waiving the Requirements of Section 345(b) of the Bankruptcy Code) filed by Tyler P. Brown of Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP on behalf of LeClairRyan PLLC. (Brown, Tyler)
Related: [-]
8 8 19 pgs motion Approve Tue 09/03 9:19 AM
Motion to Approve (Motion of LeClairRyan PLLC for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Approving Settlement Procedures for Compromising Accounts Receivable and Related Relief) filed by Jason William Harbour of Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP on behalf of LeClairRyan PLLC. (Harbour, Jason)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Motion to File Document(s) Under Seal Tue 09/03 9:26 AM
Motion to File Document(s) Under Seal (Motion of LeClairRyan PLLC Pursuant to Sections 105 and 107 of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9018 for Entry of an Order Authorizing LeClairRyan PLLC to File Under Seal Exhibit B to the Motion to LeClairRyan PLLC for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Approving Settlement Procedures and Compromising Accounts Receivable and Related Relief) Related [+] filed by Tyler P. Brown of Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP on behalf of LeClairRyan PLLC. (Brown, Tyler)
Related: [-] ument(s)8 Motion to Approve filed by LeClairRyan PLLC
10 10 motion Sealed Document Tue 09/03 9:27 AM
Sealed Exhibit Related [+] filed by Tyler P. Brown of Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP on behalf of LeClairRyan PLLC. (Brown, Tyler)
Related: [-] ument(s)8 Motion to Approve filed by LeClairRyan PLLC,9 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by LeClairRyan PLLC
11 11 motion Approve Tue 09/03 9:31 AM
Motion to Approve (Motion of LeClairRyan PLLC for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Debtor to Pay PrePetition Wages and Salaries; (II) Directing Applicable Financial Institutions to Honor and Process Related Checks and Transfers; and (III) Granting Related Relief) filed by Tyler P. Brown of Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP on behalf of LeClairRyan PLLC. (Brown, Tyler)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Assume Tue 09/03 9:40 AM
Omnibus Motion to Assume (Omnibus Motion of LeClairRyan PLLC for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtor to Assume Certain Executory Contracts) filed by Tyler P. Brown of Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP on behalf of LeClairRyan PLLC. (Brown, Tyler)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Approve Use of Cash Collateral Tue 09/03 9:42 AM
Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral (Motion of LeClairRyan PLLC for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtor to Use Cash Collateral and Granting Adequate Protection and Related Relief) filed by Tyler P. Brown of Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP on behalf of LeClairRyan PLLC. (Brown, Tyler)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Declaration Tue 09/03 9:44 AM
Declaration (Declaration of Guy A. Davis in Support of Motion of LeClairRyan PLLC for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtor to Use Cash Collateral and Granting Adequate Protection and Related Relief) Related [+] filed by Tyler P. Brown of Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP on behalf of LeClairRyan PLLC. (Brown, Tyler)
Related: [-] related document(s)13 Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral filed by LeClairRyan PLLC
15 15 motion Expedite Hearing Tue 09/03 9:54 AM
Motion to Expedite Hearing (Motion of LeClairRyan PLLC for Entry of an Order Setting an Expedited Hearing on "First Day Motions" and Related Relief) filed by Tyler P. Brown of Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP on behalf of LeClairRyan PLLC. (Brown, Tyler)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Motion and Notice of Hearing Tue 09/03 10:03 AM
Notice of Motion and Notice of Hearing (Notice of Filing of Chapter 11 Petition, First Day Motions, and Proposed Hearing on First Day Motions) Related [+] filed by Tyler P. Brown of Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP on behalf of LeClairRyan PLLC. Hearing scheduled for 9/3/2019 at 01:00 PM at Judge Phillips' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia. (Brown, Tyler)
Related: [-] related document(s)4 Motion to Approve filed by LeClairRyan PLLC,5 Motion to Extend Time to File Lists, Schedules and/or Statements filed by LeClairRyan PLLC,6 Motion to Approve filed by LeClairRyan PLLC,7 Motion to Approve filed by LeClairRyan PLLC,8 Motion to Approve filed by LeClairRyan PLLC,9 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by LeClairRyan PLLC,11 Motion to Approve filed by LeClairRyan PLLC,12 Motion to Assume filed by LeClairRyan PLLC,13 Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral filed by LeClairRyan PLLC,15 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by LeClairRyan PLLC
17 17 misc Statement Tue 09/03 10:04 AM
Statement (Proposed Agenda for Hearing on September 3, 2019 at 1:00 P.M. (Prevailing Eastern Time)) filed by Tyler P. Brown of Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP on behalf of LeClairRyan PLLC. (Brown, Tyler)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Reject Tue 09/03 10:58 AM
Omnibus Motion to Reject (Omnibus Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing LeClairRyan PLLC to (I) Reject Unexpired Leases and (II) Abandon Certain Property in Conjunction with Such Rejection) filed by Tyler P. Brown of Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP on behalf of LeClairRyan PLLC. (Brown, Tyler)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/03 11:03 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Douglas M. Foley of McGuireWoods LLP on behalf of ABL Alliance, LLLP. (Foley, Douglas)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/03 11:05 AM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Shawn R. Fox of McGuireWoods LLP filed by Douglas M. Foley of McGuireWoods LLP on behalf of ABL Alliance, LLLP. (Foley, Douglas)
Related: [-]
22 22 court Hearing held Tue 09/03 2:22 PM
Hearing held before Hon. Keith L. Phillips; Motion GRANTED. Declaration of Lori D. Thompson, Esq. #3 ADMITTED Related [+] Appearance: Tyler Brown for Debtor. (Oliver, Betty)
Related: [-] related document(s)15 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by LeClairRyan PLLC
23 23 court Hearing held Tue 09/03 2:24 PM
Hearing held before Hon. Keith L. Phillips; Motion GRANTED Related [+] Appearance: Toby Long for Debtor. (Oliver, Betty)
Related: [-] related document(s)4 Motion to Approve filed by LeClairRyan PLLC
24 24 court Hearing held Tue 09/03 2:27 PM
Hearing held before Hon. Keith L. Phillips; Motion GRANTED Related [+] Appearance: Toby Long for Debtor. (Oliver, Betty)
Related: [-] related document(s)5 Motion to Extend Time to File Lists, Schedules and/or Statements filed by LeClairRyan PLLC
25 25 court Hearing held Tue 09/03 2:29 PM
Hearing held before Hon. Keith L. Phillips; Motion GRANTED Related [+] Appearance: Toby Long for Debtor. (Oliver, Betty)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Motion to Approve filed by LeClairRyan PLLC
26 26 court Hearing held; final hearing set Tue 09/03 2:32 PM
Hearing held before Hon. Keith L. Phillips; Motion GRANTED on Interim Basis, Final Hearing Set Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 9/26/2019 at 02:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. Appearances: Toby Long for Debtor; Robert B. Van Arsdale for the Office of the U.S. Trustee. (Oliver, Betty)
Related: [-] related document(s)7 Motion to Approve filed by LeClairRyan PLLC
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/03 2:34 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Karen M. Crowley of Crowley Liberatore P.C. on behalf of Super-Server, LLC. (Crowley, Karen)
Related: [-]
28 28 court Hearing held; final hearing set Tue 09/03 2:35 PM
Hearing held before Hon. Keith L. Phillips; Motion GRANTED on Interim Basis, Final Hearing Set Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 9/26/2019 at 02:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. Appearance: Tyler Brown for Debtor. (Oliver, Betty)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Motion to Assume filed by LeClairRyan PLLC
29 29 court Hearing held Tue 09/03 2:37 PM
Hearing held before Hon. Keith L. Phillips; Motion GRANTED Related [+] Appearance: Jason Harbour for Debtor. (Oliver, Betty)
Related: [-] related document(s)9 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by LeClairRyan PLLC
30 30 court Hearing held; final hearing set Tue 09/03 2:42 PM
Hearing held before Hon. Keith L. Phillips; Motion GRANTED on Interim Basis as set out in open court, Final Hearing Set Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 9/26/2019 at 02:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. Appearances: Jason Harbour for Debtor; Douglas Foley for ABL Alliance, LLLP; Robert Van Arsdale for Office of the U.S. Trustee. (Oliver, Betty)
Related: [-] related document(s)8 Motion to Approve filed by LeClairRyan PLLC
31 31 court Hearing held; final hearing set Tue 09/03 2:45 PM
Hearing held before Hon. Keith L. Phillips; Motion GRANTED on Interim Basis as set out in open court, Final Hearing Set Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 9/26/2019 at 02:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. Appearance: Tyler Brown for Debtor. (Oliver, Betty)
Related: [-] related document(s)11 Motion to Approve filed by LeClairRyan PLLC
32 32 court Hearing held; final hearing set Tue 09/03 2:48 PM
Hearing held before Hon. Keith L. Phillips; Motion GRANTED on Interim Basis, Final Hearing Set. Declaration of Guy A. Davis #14 ADMITTED Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 9/26/2019 at 02:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. Appearances: Jason Harbour for Debtor; Douglas Foley for ABL Alliance LLLP. (Oliver, Betty)
Related: [-] related document(s)13 Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral filed by LeClairRyan PLLC
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/03 6:21 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Gabriel Gallerizzo of Gebhardt & Smith LLP on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. (Gallerizzo, Michael)
Related: [-]
34 34 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/03 6:26 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Michael D. Nord of Gebhardt & Smith LLP on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. (Nord, Michael)
Related: [-]