Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:20-ap-03051
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:May 21, 2020
Terminated:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Hippotech USA, Inc.
Represented By
Hippotech USA, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Paula S. Beran
Tavenner & Beran, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Thursday, April 03, 2025
9 9 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Thu 04/03 4:38 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Dietz, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 04/01 3:31 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Paula S. Beran of Tavenner & Beran, PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Beran, Paula)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
7 7 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Thu 09/17 5:31 PM
Withdrawal of Appearance by David N. Tabakin. (Tabakin, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2020
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Thu 07/16 10:49 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by David N. Tabakin of Tavenner & Beran PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Tabakin, David)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint,5 Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY
Thursday, June 18, 2020
5 5 summon Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY Thu 06/18 2:05 PM
Alias Summons and notice issued to Hippotech USA, Inc. Related [+] (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint
Wednesday, June 17, 2020
4 4 misc Request for Alias Summons Wed 06/17 3:54 PM
Request for Alias Summons Related [+] filed by David N. Tabakin of Tavenner & Beran PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Tabakin, David)
Related: [-] related document(s)2 Summons and Notice
Friday, May 22, 2020
3 3 crditcrd none Fri 05/22 12:31 PM
Payment Cleared on Complaint 20-03051 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 118633, amount $ 350.00 (Paid over the counter). Related [+] (Gary) Modified on 5/22/2020 (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 summon Summons and Notice; Answer Fri 05/22 11:31 AM
Summons and notice issued to Hippotech USA, Inc. Answer Due 6/22/2020 Related [+] (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint
Thursday, May 21, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 05/21 1:35 PM
Adversary case 20-03051 Complaint against Hippotech USA, Inc. filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Beran, Paula) Modified on 5/22/2020 to correct party filer (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-]