Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:20-ap-03054
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:May 21, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
The CFS Group, LLC
Represented By
The CFS Group, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Meridian Waste Acquisitions, LLC
Represented By
Meridian Waste Acquisitions, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Paula S. Beran
Tavenner & Beran, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, September 17, 2020
7 7 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Thu 09/17 5:31 PM
Withdrawal of Appearance by David N. Tabakin. (Tabakin, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2020
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Thu 07/16 10:52 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by David N. Tabakin of Tavenner & Beran PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Tabakin, David)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint,5 Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY
Thursday, June 18, 2020
5 5 summon Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY Thu 06/18 2:12 PM
Alias Summons and notice issued to Meridian Waste Acquisitions, LLC ; The CFS Group, LLC Related [+] (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint
Wednesday, June 17, 2020
4 4 misc Request for Alias Summons Wed 06/17 3:56 PM
Request for Alias Summons Related [+] filed by David N. Tabakin of Tavenner & Beran PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Tabakin, David)
Related: [-] related document(s)2 Summons and Notice
Friday, May 22, 2020
3 3 crditcrd none Fri 05/22 12:31 PM
Payment Cleared on Complaint 20-03054 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 118633, amount $ 350.00 (Paid over the counter). Related [+] (Gary) Modified on 5/22/2020 (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 summon Summons and Notice; Answer Fri 05/22 11:51 AM
Summons and notice issued to Meridian Waste Acquisitions, LLC Answer Due 6/22/2020; The CFS Group, LLC Answer Due 6/22/2020 Related [+] (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint
Thursday, May 21, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 05/21 1:41 PM
Adversary case 20-03054 Complaint against The CFS Group, LLC, Meridian Waste Acquisitions, LLC filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Beran, Paula) Modified on 5/22/2020 to correct party filer (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-]